This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 10:54:35 (UTC).

Reckless Enterprises Inc v. First Mercury Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 Reckless Enterprises Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against First Mercury Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00471

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Reckless Enterprises Inc. doing business as Reckless Noodle House

Reckless Enterprises Inc doing business as Reckless Noodle House

Counter Claimant and Defendant

First Mercury Insurance Company

Counter Defendant

Reckless Enterprises Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Gabriel Verdugo

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Nathan L Nanfelt

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Neil Thomas Lindquist

Attorney at KORNFELD TRUDELL BOWEN & LINDQUIST PLLC

4055 Lake Washington Blvd Ne Ste 240

Kirkland, WA 98033

Amy C Williams-Derry

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Ian S Birk

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Kasie Kashimoto

Attorney at LETHER LAW GROUP

1848 Westlake Ave N Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Thomas Lether

Attorney at LETHER LAW GROUP

1848 Westlake Ave N Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Eric J Neal

Attorney at LETHER LAW GROUP

1848 Westlake Ave N Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98109

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Reckless Enterprises Inc, Counter Defendant Reckless Enterprises Inc, TO RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Stay (Nanfelt, Nathan) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

23 #4

Exhibit 4

23 #3

Exhibit 3

23 #2

Exhibit 2

23 #1

Exhibit 1

23 #23

Main Document

22 #22

Main Document

15 #1

Proposed Order

15 #15

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit 1

2 #2

Main Document

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Reckless Enterprises Inc, Counter Defendant Reckless Enterprises Inc, TO RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Stay (Nanfelt, Nathan) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DECLARATION of Eric J. Neal filed by Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company re #15 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Neal, Eric) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE, by Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company, to #15 MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neal, Eric) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DECLARATION of Carole Kordsmeier filed by Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Neal, Eric) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DECLARATION of Eric J. Neal filed by Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Eric) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neal, Eric) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Plaintiff's ANSWER to #14 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Reckless Enterprises Inc.(Nanfelt, Nathan) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Neil Thomas Lindquist. Filed by Plaintiff Reckless Enterprises Inc. (Lindquist, Neil) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/13/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/21/2022. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Stay , filed by Plaintiff Reckless Enterprises Inc, Counter Defendant Reckless Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nanfelt, Nathan) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only). Jury Demand info added to transfer letter in error. (RE) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND-properly submitted federal court jury demand on file. No Jury Demand filed. (RE) Modified on 4/13/2022 to edit Jury Demand info. (RE) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Reckless Enterprises Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/19/2022. (RE) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Reckless Enterprises Inc. by First Mercury Insurance Company.(Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd, Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp, Corporate Parent Fairfax, (US) Inc. for First Mercury Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by First Mercury Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kasie Kashimoto on behalf of Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company. (Kashimoto, Kasie) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Lether on behalf of Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Carole Kordsmeier re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Eric) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-03499-8; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7508466) Attorney Eric J Neal added to party First Mercury Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by First Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Neal, Eric) Modified on 4/13/2022 to add document title. (RE) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Mercury Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil Thomas Lindquist

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gabriel Verdugo