This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/05/2019 at 07:48:08 (UTC).

Rech v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 Rech filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02514

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wanda O Rech

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond T Wooten

Attorney at Smith Jordan Lavery and Lee

Po Box 1207

Easley, SC 29641

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Laffitte

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

John M Montgomery

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Rachel M Hutchens

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Vordman Carlisle Traywick

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/29/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/29/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/10/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/13/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/26/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/26/2020, Discovery due by 5/22/2020, Motions due by 6/19/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/14/2020, Mediation Due by 5/22/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/16/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#10

(#10) Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East LP.(Laffitte, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laffitte, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/24/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#7

(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/15/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/29/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/29/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/19/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/19/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/21/2020, Discovery due by 3/23/2020, Motions due by 4/22/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 7/21/2020, Mediation Due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/24/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#6

(#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wanda O Rech.(Wooten, Raymond) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(alew, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(alew, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-37-00475. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8654808), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(alew, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/29/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/29/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/10/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/13/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/26/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/26/2020, Discovery due by 5/22/2020, Motions due by 6/19/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/14/2020, Mediation Due by 5/22/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/16/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East LP.(Laffitte, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laffitte, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/24/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/15/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/29/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/29/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/19/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/19/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/21/2020, Discovery due by 3/23/2020, Motions due by 4/22/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 7/21/2020, Mediation Due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/24/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wanda O Rech.(Wooten, Raymond) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(alew, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(alew, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-37-00475. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8654808), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(alew, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M Montgomery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Laffitte

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vordman Carlisle Traywick