This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2019 at 07:49:03 (UTC).

REC Marine Logistics, LLC v. Richard

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 REC Marine Logistics, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Richard. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana Douglas and Lance M Africk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11149

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

Presiding Judge

Lance M Africk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Not Yet Classified

REC Marine Logistics, LLC

3Rd Party Plaintiffs, Defendants, Counter Claimants and Not Yet Classified

DeQuincy R. Richard

REC Marine Logistics, LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C.

Offshore Transport Services, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Fred E. Salley

Attorney at Salley & Associates

P. O. Box 3549

Covington, LA 70434

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Eric Jonathan Rhine

Attorney at Spagnoletti & Co.

401 Louisiana St., 8Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Katherine Wiarda Lynch

Attorney at Koch & Schmidt, LLC

650 Poydras St., Suite 2660

New Orleans, LA 70130

Robert Joshua Koch, Jr.

Attorney at Koch & Schmidt, LLC

650 Poydras St., Suite 2660

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DeQuincy R. Richard (Filing fee $47 receipt number 053L-7700032) filed by REC Marine Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Fred E. Salley added to party REC Marine Logistics, LLC(pty:pla).(Salley, Fred) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (sbs). (Entered: 06/11/2019)

6 #4

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Jonathan Rhine. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Koch, Robert) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

6 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

8 #1

Notice

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Eric J Rhine) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7796202) by DeQuincy R. Richard. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Efiling Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Koch, Robert) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C., Offshore Transport Services, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Offshore Transport Services, L.L.C., Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C., COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against REC Marine Logistics, LLC by DeQuincy R. Richard.Attorney Robert Joshua Koch, Jr added to party DeQuincy R. Richard(pty:dft).(Koch, Robert) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

7 #1

Summons

6 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to DeQuincy R. Richard. (sbs) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Jonathan Rhine. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C., Offshore Transport Services, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Eric J Rhine) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7796202) by DeQuincy R. Richard. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Efiling Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Koch, Robert) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Koch, Robert) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Offshore Transport Services, L.L.C., Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C., COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against REC Marine Logistics, LLC by DeQuincy R. Richard.Attorney Robert Joshua Koch, Jr added to party DeQuincy R. Richard(pty:dft).(Koch, Robert) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to DeQuincy R. Richard. (sbs) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (gk) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Filing fee received: $400 - Receipt #LAE056399 (gk) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DeQuincy R. Richard (Filing fee $47 receipt number 053L-7700032) filed by REC Marine Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Fred E. Salley added to party REC Marine Logistics, LLC(pty:pla).(Salley, Fred) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (sbs). (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.