This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 09:02:56 (UTC).

Rebmann v. Astec, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Rebmann filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Astec, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Sinatra, Jr. and H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00879

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Sinatra, Jr.

Referral Judge

H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Rebmann

Defendants

Astec, Inc.

Astec Industries, Inc.

Astec, Inc. doing business as Astec of Tennessee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James T. Scime

Attorney at Lipsitz Green Scime Cambria LLP

42 Delaware Avenue, Suite 120

Buffalo, NY 14202

Melissa Dorothy Wischerath

Attorney at Lipsitz Green Scime Cambria LLP

42 Delaware Avenue, Suite 120

Buffalo, NY 14202

Defendant Attorneys

David R. Adams

Attorney at Hurwitz & Fine, P.C.

1300 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Jeffrey Granillo

Attorney at Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel, P.C.

Suite 1700, 605 Chestnut Street

Chattanooga, TN 37450

John Grayson Chambers

Attorney at Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel, P.C.

Suite 1700, 605 Chestnut Street

Chattanooga, TN 37450

William R Dearing

Attorney at Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel, P.C.

Suite 1700, 605 Chestnut Street

Chattanooga, TN 37450

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

13 #1

Exhibit 1 - Proposed Scheduling Order

#13

12 #3

Consent Form

12 #2

Consent Memorandum

12 #1

Case Management Order Form

#12

7 #3

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Grayson

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - Specific Relief Response

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Demand for Specific Relief

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - EBT Notice

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Answer

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Supplemental AOS

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - AOS Astec Industries

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons & Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Index

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc. (Granillo, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 9/29/2021; Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 11/19/2021; First Mediation Session due by 12/1/2021; Motions to Compel Discovery due by 7/15/2022; Discovery completed by 8/5/2022; Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 9/2/2022; Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 9/30/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 12/30/2022; Mediation To End by 1/20/2023. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 9/16/2021. (LMG) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCOVERY PLAN by Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Granillo, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 8/25/21. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(#11) TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/25/2021. (KLH) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission for William R. Dearing. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/24/2021. (KEF)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission for Jeffrey G. Granillo. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/24/2021. (KEF)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John Grayson Chambers. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/24/2021. (KEF)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: #5 MOTION to appear pro hac vice; modified entry to correct name of attorney. (JLV) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to appear pro hac vice William R. Dearing ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4338319.) by Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Granillo, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Grayson, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Dearing, #5 Court Pro Hac Forms)(Adams, David) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to appear pro hac vice John Grayson Chambers ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4338239.) by Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Granillo, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Grayson, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Dearing, #5 Court Pro Hac Forms)(Adams, David) Modified on 8/20/2021 (JLV). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Adams, David) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Dorothy Wischerath on behalf of Anthony Rebmann (Wischerath, Melissa) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on James T. Scime, Esq. on August 4, 2021, filed by Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc.. (Adams, David) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc. from Supreme Erie County, case number 804068/2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4322174), filed by Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - AOS Astec Inc., #4 Exhibit 4 - AOS Astec Industries, #5 Exhibit 5 - Supplemental AOS, #6 Exhibit 6 - Answer, #7 Exhibit 7 - EBT Notice, #8 Exhibit 8 - Demand for Specific Relief, #9 Exhibit 9 - Specific Relief Response, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, David) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASTEC,Ltd d/b/a Sprouts Extraordinaire, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTEC INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Granillo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William R. Dearing