This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2021 at 07:20:37 (UTC).

Rebecca T. Pascua v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Rebecca T Pascua filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and John F. Walter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03812

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REBECCA T. PASCUA

Defendant

BMW of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James P Martinez

Attorney at California Consumer Attorneys PC

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Michael H Rosenstein

Attorney at California Consumer Attorneys PC

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Sepehr Daghighian

Attorney at California Consumer Attorneys PC

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Andrew K Stefatos

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Benson Yeager Douglas

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2022 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 3/4/2022 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 3/15/2022 at 8:30 AM. (iv) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on June 7, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: December 13, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: December 17, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Rebecca T. Pascua.. (Martinez, James) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Michael H. Rosenstein as Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Rebecca T. Pascua. (Rosenstein, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Declaration #15 by Judge John F. Walter. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by Monday, May 24, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declaration #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) **STRICKEN** DECLARATION of Michael H. Rosenstein as Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Rebecca T. Pascua. (Rosenstein, Michael) Modified on 5/21/2021 Per Order #16 . (iv). (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rebecca T. Pascua, (Rosenstein, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael H Rosenstein on behalf of Plaintiff Rebecca T. Pascua (Rosenstein, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sepehr Daghighian on behalf of Plaintiff Rebecca T. Pascua (Daghighian, Sepehr) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/4/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (Attorney Benson Yeager Douglas added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(et) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does 1 through 10, inclusive., filed by Plaintiff Rebecca T. Pascua. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/2/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Jury Demand #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on May 5, 2021. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying Rebecca T. Pascua, BMW of North America, LLC and BMW(US) Holding Corp.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV12659 Receipt No: ACACDC-31242399 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-MBUSA's Conformed Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Sales Contract) (Attorney Andrew K Stefatos added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew K Stefatos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benson Yeager Douglas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman