This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:41:00 (UTC).

Reaves v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Reaves filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04818

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Reaves

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sofia E Bruera

Attorney at Bruera Law Firm PLLC

3100 Timmons Lane, Ste 310

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorney

John A. Ramirez

Attorney at Bush Ramirez, LLC

5615 Kirby Dr, Ste 900

Houston, TX 77005

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court)

1 #3

Exhibit Original Answer (State Court)

1 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 129th District Court, Harris County, case number 2019-80426 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23746742) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Answer (State Court), #4 Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court))(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 129th District Court, Harris County, case number 2019-80426 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23746742) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Answer (State Court), #4 Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court))(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.