This case was last updated from PACER on 06/26/2021 at 08:35:05 (UTC).

Reams v. Local 18, International Union of Operating Engineers et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Reams filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Local 18, International Union of Operating Engineers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James R. Knepp II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00878

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Knepp II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEIDI REAMS

Defendants

INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS

BRETT LAFASO

Local 18, International Union of Operating Engineers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frederick M. Bean

Attorney at Spitz Law Firm

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Taurean J. Shattuck

Attorney at Spitz Law

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

David E. Byrnes

Attorney at Spitz Law Firm

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Defendant Attorney

Timothy R. Fadel

Attorney at Lee Fadel & Beyer

18500 Lake Road

Rocky River, OH 44116

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon International Union of Operating Engineers on 5/14/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Heidi Reams (K,AR) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#7

(#7) Attorney Appearance by Timothy R. Fadel filed on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers. (Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#6

(#6) Attorney Appearance by Timothy R. Fadel filed on behalf of Brett Lafaso. (Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. International Union of Operating Engineers waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bean, Frederick) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#4

(#4) Amended complaint for Damages and Reinstatement against All Defendants. Filed by Heidi Reams. (Bean, Frederick) Modified party name and text on 5/27/2021 (M,L). (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#3

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Brett Lafaso on 5/11/2021, filed on behalf of Heidi Reams Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (S,DM) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Defendant's #8 Motion for Extension of Time until 7/16/2021 to Answer. Defendant Brett Lafaso answer now due 7/16/2021. Judge James R. Knepp II on 5/26/2021. (S,JM) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon International Union of Operating Engineers on 5/14/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Heidi Reams (K,AR) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for extension of time until July 16, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Brett Lafaso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Exhibit B: Email)(Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by Timothy R. Fadel filed on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers. (Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Attorney Appearance by Timothy R. Fadel filed on behalf of Brett Lafaso. (Fadel, Timothy) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. International Union of Operating Engineers waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bean, Frederick) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended complaint for Damages and Reinstatement against All Defendants. Filed by Heidi Reams. (Bean, Frederick) Modified party name and text on 5/27/2021 (M,L). (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Brett Lafaso on 5/11/2021, filed on behalf of Heidi Reams Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (S,DM) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to International Union of Operating Engineers and Brett Lafaso placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 7019 0700 0001 8423 7568 for International Union of Operating Engineers and Receipt # 7019 0700 0001 8423 7735 for Brett Lafaso. (K,AR) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon International Union of Operating Engineers, Brett Lafaso. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketJudge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (M,L) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for Damages and Reinstatement with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10802692. Filed by Heidi Reams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 1, #3 Summons 2, #4 Right to Sue) (Bean, Frederick) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taurean J. Shattuck

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Merl Bean