This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:17:19 (UTC).

Realm Licensing LLC v. SmartRecruiters, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Realm Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SmartRecruiters, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00769

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Realm Licensing LLC

Defendant

SmartRecruiters, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Defendant Attorneys

Bindu Ann George Palapura

Edward F. Roche

Robert Joseph Morris

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

List of Related Cases

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#16

#6

#7

#8

#9

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER, having been assigned the above-captioned related cases; IT IS ORDERED that, on or before August 27, 2021, counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/27/2021.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/26/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00110-CFC et al.(nmf) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 23, 2021 filed by SmartRecruiters, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: SmartRecruiters, Inc. answer due 8/23/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/12/2021. (fms) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 23, 2021 - filed by SmartRecruiters, Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Robert Joseph Morris, Edward F. Roche for SmartRecruiters, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Joseph Morris and Edward F. Roche of Smith, Anderson, Blount, Dorsett, Mitchell & Jernigan, LLP filed by SmartRecruiters, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/14/2021. (fms) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 23, 2021 filed by SmartRecruiters, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: SmartRecruiters, Inc. answer due 7/23/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/14/2021. (fms) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 23, 2021 - filed by SmartRecruiters, Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Joseph Morris and Edward F. Roche of Smith, Anderson, Blount, Dorsett, Mitchell & Jernigan, LLP - filed by SmartRecruiters, Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Realm Licensing LLC. SmartRecruiters, Inc. served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00762-CFC, 1:21-cv-00765-CFC, 1:21-cv-00766-CFC, 1:21-cv-00767-CFC, 1:21-cv-00769-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,324,551 ;6,330,573. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against SmartRecruiters, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3624610.) - filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 List of Related Cases, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less