This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:17:03 (UTC).

Realm Licensing LLC v. Laserfiche-North America Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Realm Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Laserfiche-North America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00767

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Realm Licensing LLC

Defendant

Laserfiche-North America Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Notice

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Related Cases

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,324,551 ;6,330,573. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(fms) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CLOSED per D.I. #8 . (fms) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Realm Licensing LLC as to Lasefiche-North America Inc (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to 07/23/21 filed by Realm Licensing LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Laserfiche-North America Inc. answer due 7/23/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/22/2021. (fms) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to 07/23/21 - filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Realm Licensing LLC. Laserfiche-North America Inc. served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00762-CFC, 1:21-cv-00765-CFC, 1:21-cv-00766-CFC, 1:21-cv-00767-CFC, 1:21-cv-00769-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (mal) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,324,551 ;6,330,573. (mal) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Laserfiche-North America Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3624561.) - filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Related Cases)(mal) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less