This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 08:59:00 (UTC).

Realm Licensing LLC v. Avaya Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Realm Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Avaya Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00105

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Realm Licensing LLC

Defendant

Avaya Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Defendant Attorney

Jack B. Blumenfeld

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to April 30, 2021 filed by Avaya Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Avaya Inc. answer due 4/30/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/26/2021. (fms) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to April 30, 2021 - filed by Avaya Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Realm Licensing LLC. Avaya Inc. served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00105-CFC, 1:21-cv-00107-CFC, 1:21-cv-00109-CFC, 1:21-cv-00110-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (kmd) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,324,551; 6,330,573. (kmd) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Avaya Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3494700.) - filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less