This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2021 at 09:23:32 (UTC).

Realm Licensing LLC v. Asana, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Realm Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Asana, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00485

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Realm Licensing LLC

Defendant

Asana, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Mark Moshos

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Asana, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 10, 2021 filed by Asana, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Asana, Inc. answer due 6/10/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/27/2021. (fms) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Asana, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 10, 2021 - filed by Asana, Inc.. (Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Asana, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 27, 2021 filed by Asana, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Asana, Inc. answer due 5/27/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/26/2021. (fms) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Asana, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 27, 2021 - filed by Asana, Inc.. (Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Realm Licensing LLC. Asana, Inc. served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (apk) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,324,551 ;6,330,573. (apk) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Asana, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3583586.) - filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Realm Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASANA WELLNESS CENTER, L.L.C. A/A/O ROBERT CRANE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Mark Moshos