This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2022 at 14:04:23 (UTC).

RCL Track Services, LLC v. Ferrion, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 RCL Track Services, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ferrion, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02833

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RCL Track Services, LLC

Defendant

Ferrion, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric A. Larson

Attorney at Morris Manning & Martin, LLP

1600 Atlanta Financial Center, 3343 Peachtree Rd., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1044

Nathan R. Miles

Attorney at Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP

3343 Peachtree Road, Ne, 1600 Atlanta Financial Center

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by RCL Track Services, LLC. Ferrion, LLC served on 10/10/2022. (Larson, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ferrion, LLC. (tas) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

1 #17

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #16

Exhibit P

1 #15

Exhibit O

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by RCL Track Services, LLC. Ferrion, LLC served on 10/10/2022. (Larson, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ferrion, LLC. (tas) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by RCL Track Services, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11936040) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan R. Miles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric A. Larson