This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 07:44:09 (UTC).

RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Arch Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Bloom and Lauren Fleischer Louis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-23401

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

Referral Judge

Lauren Fleischer Louis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.

Defendant

Arch Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Mineo, Jr.

Attorney at The Mineo Salcedo Law Firm, PA

5600 Davie Road

Davie, FL 33314

Justin Arnold

Attorney at The Mineo Diener Law Firm, P.A.

5400 S. University Drive, Suite 502

Davie, FL 33328

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Sblano

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N. Ashley Dr, Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Christopher M. Ramey

Attorney at Butler Pappas Weihmuller Katz Craig

777 S Harbour Island Boulevard, One Harbour Place Suite 500

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Motion, ECF No. #14 is GRANTED. The above-styled case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. To the extent not otherwise disposed of, all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Motions terminated: #14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Plaintiff's Complaint filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., #7 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION re #7 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint.( Responses due by 9/11/2020) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#14

(#14) Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Plaintiff's Complaint by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 9/22/2020 (Arnold, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#13

(#13) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Miami Gardens Square One, Inc. d/b/a Tootsies Cabaret, Other Affiliate RCI Holdings (183rd Street), Inc., Other Affiliate Eric S. Langan, Other Affiliate Ed Anakar, Other Affiliate Phillip Desamours for RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. (Arnold, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020., Discovery due by 6/1/2021., Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 11/2/2020., Mediation Deadline 6/15/2021., In Limine Motions due by 6/23/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2021., Motions due by 6/23/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/13/2021., Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 9/21/2021 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 6/15/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/04/2020)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order

#11

(#11) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Ramey, Christopher) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Arnold on behalf of RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. Attorney Justin Arnold added to party RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.(pty:pla). (Arnold, Justin) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#7

(#7) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/4/2020 (Ramey, Christopher) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

1 #8

State Court Complaint

1 #7

Docket Sheet Miami Dade Clerk Docket

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 5 - POL

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Company information for RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - floir company information for Arch Specialty Insurance Co.

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Policy

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Comp. - State Court Filings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - In the Circuit Court of the 11th Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade, FL) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13358939, filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Comp. - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Policy, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - floir company information for Arch Specialty Insurance Co., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Company information for RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - POL, #7 Docket Sheet Miami Dade Clerk Docket, #8 State Court Complaint)(Ramey, Christopher)(No Answer/ Motion to Dismiss filed) Text Modified on 8/17/2020 (amb). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Motion, ECF No. #14 is GRANTED. The above-styled case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. To the extent not otherwise disposed of, all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Motions terminated: #14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Plaintiff's Complaint filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., #7 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION re #7 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint.( Responses due by 9/11/2020) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Plaintiff's Complaint by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 9/22/2020 (Arnold, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Miami Gardens Square One, Inc. d/b/a Tootsies Cabaret, Other Affiliate RCI Holdings (183rd Street), Inc., Other Affiliate Eric S. Langan, Other Affiliate Ed Anakar, Other Affiliate Phillip Desamours for RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. (Arnold, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020., Discovery due by 6/1/2021., Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 11/2/2020., Mediation Deadline 6/15/2021., In Limine Motions due by 6/23/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2021., Motions due by 6/23/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/13/2021., Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 9/21/2021 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 6/15/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Ramey, Christopher) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Arnold on behalf of RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. Attorney Justin Arnold added to party RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.(pty:pla). (Arnold, Justin) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd., Other Affiliate Ed Anakar, Other Affiliate Eric S. Langan, Other Affiliate Accurate Claim Solutions, Other Affiliate Phillip Desamours, Other Affiliate Tammie Smith, Other Affiliate Tootsie's Cabaret for Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Sblano, Justin) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramey, Christopher) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/4/2020 (Ramey, Christopher) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates (Accurate Claim Solutions,Phillip Desamours, American Eagle Public Adjusters,etc.). Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ail) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd. for Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Sblano, Justin) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Arch Specialty Insurance Company of Filing True and Correct Copy of the Docket Sheet (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (Sblano, Justin) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Arch Specialty Insurance Company response due 8/24/2020. On or before August 24, 2020, Defendant shall file a notice with the Court attaching a true and correct copy of the docket sheet in the Circuit Court Action. On or before August 31, 2020, the parties shall comply with Local Rule 7.2 to the extent there are any motions pending in the Circuit Court Action, and shall separately re-file the motion, relevant memoranda of law in support of or opposition to those motions. Plaintiff may file a motion to remand this case on or before September 16, 2020.2 Deadlines with respect to such motion will be governed by all relevant Local Rules. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/8/2020 Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - In the Circuit Court of the 11th Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade, FL) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13358939, filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Comp. - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Policy, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - floir company information for Arch Specialty Insurance Co., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Company information for RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - POL, #7 Docket Sheet Miami Dade Clerk Docket, #8 State Court Complaint)(Ramey, Christopher)(No Answer/ Motion to Dismiss filed) Text Modified on 8/17/2020 (amb). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RCI Hospitality Holdings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Arch Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant