This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:06:09 (UTC).

RBH ENERGY, LLC v. METRO COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 RBH ENERGY, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against METRO COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05747

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RBH ENERGY, LLC

Defendants

MARK GERLACH

METRO COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE, INC.

DANIEL J. HUGHES

METRO COMMERCIAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GAETAN ALFANO

Attorney at PIETRAGALLO GORDON ALFANO BOSICK & RASPANTI LLP

1818 Market Street, Suite 3402

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DANA LEJUNE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DANA LEJUNE

1225 N Loop West Suite 825

Houston, TX 77008

DOUGLAS E. ROBERTS

Attorney at PIETRAGALLO GORDON ALFANO BOSICK & RASPANTI

1818 Market St Suite 3402

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SCOTT M. FRANCIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE DANA LEJUNE

1225 N Loop West Suite 825

Houston, TX 77008

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF SCOTT FRANCIS, ESQUIRE AND THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF DANA LEJUNE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/26/19. 12/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Dana LeJune, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13990393.) filed by RBH ENERGY, LLC.Certificate of Good Standing.(ROBERTS, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott Francis, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13990355.) filed by RBH ENERGY, LLC.Certificate of Good Standing.(ROBERTS, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS E. ROBERTS on behalf of RBH ENERGY, LLC (ROBERTS, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RBH ENERGY, LLC.(ALFANO, GAETAN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MARK GERLACH, DANIEL J. HUGHES, METRO COMMERCIAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., METRO COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13971814.), filed by RBH ENERGY, LLC.(ALFANO, GAETAN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF SCOTT FRANCIS, ESQUIRE AND THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF DANA LEJUNE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/26/19. 12/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Dana LeJune, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13990393.) filed by RBH ENERGY, LLC.Certificate of Good Standing.(ROBERTS, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott Francis, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13990355.) filed by RBH ENERGY, LLC.Certificate of Good Standing.(ROBERTS, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS E. ROBERTS on behalf of RBH ENERGY, LLC (ROBERTS, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by RBH ENERGY, LLC. (jl, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket4 Summons Issued as to MARK GERLACH, DANIEL J. HUGHES, METRO COMMERCIAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., METRO COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE, INC.. Forwarded To: GAETAN ALFANO on 12/9/19 (jl, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RBH ENERGY, LLC.(ALFANO, GAETAN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MARK GERLACH, DANIEL J. HUGHES, METRO COMMERCIAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., METRO COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13971814.), filed by RBH ENERGY, LLC.(ALFANO, GAETAN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less