This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 13:49:31 (UTC).

Raytheon Company v. Ahtna Support and Training Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Raytheon Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ahtna Support and Training Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca Grady Jennings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00239

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Grady Jennings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raytheon Company

Defendants

David L. Metcalf

Ahtna Netiye', LLC

Ahtna Support and Training Services, LLC

Thomas M. Owens

Gregory L. Hart, II

Ahtna, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rodney D. Payne

Attorney at Boehl Stopher & Graves, LLP - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, Suite 2300

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

6 #5

Summons - Ahtna Netiye

6 #4

Summons - Ahtna Support

6 #3

Summons - Ahtna, Inc.

6 #2

Summons - Hart

6 #1

Summons - Metcalf

#6

(#6) Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Metcalf, #2 Summons - Hart, #3 Summons - Ahtna, Inc., #4 Summons - Ahtna Support, #5 Summons - Ahtna Netiye) (SMJ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

5 #6

Summons

5 #5

Summons

5 #4

Summons

5 #3

Summons

5 #2

Summons

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing Tendered Summons by Raytheon Company re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Payne, Rodney) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying corporate parent Raytheon Technologies Corporation, by Raytheon Company. (Payne, Rodney) Modified on 4/15/2021, party added (SMJ). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (MNM) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ahtna Netiye', LLC, Ahtna Support and Training Services, LLC, Ahtna, Incorporated, Gregory L. Hart, II, David L. Metcalf, and Thomas M. Owens. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3324692, filed by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (MNM) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Metcalf, #2 Summons - Hart, #3 Summons - Ahtna, Inc., #4 Summons - Ahtna Support, #5 Summons - Ahtna Netiye) (SMJ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Tendered Summons by Raytheon Company re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Payne, Rodney) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying corporate parent Raytheon Technologies Corporation, by Raytheon Company. (Payne, Rodney) Modified on 4/15/2021, party added (SMJ). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (MNM) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (MNM) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ahtna Netiye', LLC, Ahtna Support and Training Services, LLC, Ahtna, Incorporated, Gregory L. Hart, II, David L. Metcalf, and Thomas M. Owens. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3324692, filed by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (MNM) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ahtna, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RAYTHEON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodney Dale Payne