This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 10:27:18 (UTC).

Ray v. Ratzell et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Ray filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ratzell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina Y. Wang and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00753

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Ray

Defendants

Rebekah Ratzell

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DezaRae D. LaCrue

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Elisabeth L. Owen

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

John Carl Friedberg

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

32 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#32

(#32) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Michelle Ray. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Owen, Elisabeth) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#31

(#31) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/27/21 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/20/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#30

(#30) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/26/21 granting #27 Joint Motion to Stay Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on the Basis of Fraudulent Joinder. Plaintiff's Response deadline and Ms. Ratzell's Reply deadline are STAYED pending the presiding judge's adjudication of the Motion to Certify. Within seven (7) days of the entry of the presiding judge's Order adjudicating the Motion to Certify, Ms. Ratzell shall file a Status Report indicating whether she intends to proceed with her Motion to Dismiss. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#27

(#27) Joint MOTION to Stay re #13 MOTION to Dismiss on the Basis of Fraudulent Joinder by Plaintiff Michelle Ray. (Friedberg, John) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

13 #4

Exhibit Seiwald Order

13 #3

Exhibit Contreras Order

13 #2

Exhibit Rivera Order

13 #1

Exhibit Frerichs Order

1 #11

State Court - Waiver and Acceptance of Service

1 #10

State Court - Initial Case Management Order

1 #8

State Court - Summons to Rebekah Ratzell

1 #7

State Court - Summons to Auto-Owners

1 #5

State Court - Return of Service

1 #4

State Court - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respo

1 #3

State Court - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Rebekah Ratzell from Arapahoe County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2021cv30270. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7762193), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Rebekah Ratzell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 State Court - Complaint, #4 State Court - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond, #5 State Court - Return of Service, #6 State Court - District Civil Case Cover Sheet, #7 State Court - Summons to Auto-Owners, #8 State Court - Summons to Rebekah Ratzell, #9 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #10 State Court - Initial Case Management Order, #11 State Court - Waiver and Acceptance of Service, #12 USDC Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elisabeth L. Owen is hereby terminated. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/4/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, ) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Michelle Ray. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Owen, Elisabeth) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/27/21 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/20/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/26/21 granting #27 Joint Motion to Stay Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on the Basis of Fraudulent Joinder. Plaintiff's Response deadline and Ms. Ratzell's Reply deadline are STAYED pending the presiding judge's adjudication of the Motion to Certify. Within seven (7) days of the entry of the presiding judge's Order adjudicating the Motion to Certify, Ms. Ratzell shall file a Status Report indicating whether she intends to proceed with her Motion to Dismiss. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #27 Joint MOTION to Stay re #13 MOTION to Dismiss on the Basis of Fraudulent Joinder filed by Michelle Ray. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/23/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Michelle Ray (LaCrue, DezaRae) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Joint MOTION to Stay re #13 MOTION to Dismiss on the Basis of Fraudulent Joinder by Plaintiff Michelle Ray. (Friedberg, John) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. For good cause shown, Plaintiff may file her response no later than April 29, 2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/15/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION for Order to to Certify a Legal Question filed by Defendants Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Rebekah Ratzell. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Extension of Time to , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Plaintiff Michelle Ray. (Friedberg, John) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elisabeth L. Owen on behalf of Michelle RayAttorney Elisabeth L. Owen added to party Michelle Ray(pty:pla) (Owen, Elisabeth) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Carl Friedberg on behalf of Michelle RayAttorney John Carl Friedberg added to party Michelle Ray(pty:pla) (Friedberg, John) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. District Court, Arapahoe County, State of Colorado on 02/18/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Rebekah Ratzell on 02/11/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Rebekah Ratzell, filed by Michelle Ray.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Rebekah Ratzell from Arapahoe County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2021cv30270. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7762193), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Rebekah Ratzell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 State Court - Complaint, #4 State Court - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond, #5 State Court - Return of Service, #6 State Court - District Civil Case Cover Sheet, #7 State Court - Summons to Auto-Owners, #8 State Court - Summons to Rebekah Ratzell, #9 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #10 State Court - Initial Case Management Order, #11 State Court - Waiver and Acceptance of Service, #12 USDC Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elisabeth L. Owen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DezaRae D. LaCrue