This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:35:55 (UTC).

Ray v. Finley

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Ray filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Finley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are PT and A. Richard Caputo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00988

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

PT

Presiding Judge

A. Richard Caputo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Steven L. Ray

Minersville, PA 17954

Respondent

Scott Finley

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Envelope

#1

(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Steven L. Ray. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Steven L. Ray. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Compel by Steven L. Ray. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER administratively terminating the action. If Petitioner wishes to reopen this action, he shall pay the filing fee of $5.00, or notify the Court in writing as directed no latter than 30 days from the date of this order. Clerk directed to send to Petitioner a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation and authorization form. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 4/24/19. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT administratively terminating the action. Signed by Clerk on 4/26/19. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#7

(#9) TEXT ORDER. On May 22, 2019, Plaintiff filed a #8 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Courts Order denying bail in a separate criminal proceeding in this Court (US v. Ray, 15-CR-06004, #145). Plaintiff's motion is dated May 19, 2019 and was thus mailed to the Court prior to the Court's #7 Order filed May 22, 2019, transferring this action to the United States District Court, Middle District of Pennsylvania. Because the motion for reconsideration should have been filed only in the aforementioned criminal proceeding, the Clerk of Court is directed to remove the #8 MOTION for Reconsideration from the docket in this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 5/29/19. (PR)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#8

(#9) TEXT ORDER. On May 22, 2019, Plaintiff filed a #8 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Courts Order denying bail in a separate criminal proceeding in this Court (US v. Ray, 15-CR-06004, #145). Plaintiff's motion is dated May 19, 2019 and was thus mailed to the Court prior to the Court's #7 Order filed May 22, 2019, transferring this action to the United States District Court, Middle District of Pennsylvania. Because the motion for reconsideration should have been filed only in the aforementioned criminal proceeding, the Clerk of Court is directed to remove the #8 MOTION for Reconsideration from the docket in this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 5/29/19. (PR)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#22

(#22) Letter from pltf Steven Ray -RE; Compassionate Release (cl) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#21

(#21) MOTION the Government to file a response to rule 35 request by Steven L. Ray.(ep) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#20

(#20) Letter from Steven Ray RE: Request for Status of Case (kpf) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#19

(#19) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333066568. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ga) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#18

(#18) Letter dtd 7/1/19 from Steven L. Ray RE: Filing fee (ao) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#17

(#17) Petition for Compassionate Release by Steven L. Ray. (bg) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER denying #6 and (14) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, Mr. Ray shall forward to: "Clerk, U.S. District Court, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501," a check or money order in the amount of $ 5.00 payable to "Clerk, U.S. District Court." If this fee is received, the Court will screen Mr. Rays petition. If, however, Petitioner fails to pay the requisite filing fee, his petition will be dismissed without prejudice.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/28/2019 (bg) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#6

(#16) ORDER denying #6 and (14) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, Mr. Ray shall forward to: "Clerk, U.S. District Court, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501," a check or money order in the amount of $ 5.00 payable to "Clerk, U.S. District Court." If this fee is received, the Court will screen Mr. Rays petition. If, however, Petitioner fails to pay the requisite filing fee, his petition will be dismissed without prejudice.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/28/2019 (bg) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#15

RESTRICTED

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Letter from pltf Steven Ray -RE; Compassionate Release (cl) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION the Government to file a response to rule 35 request by Steven L. Ray.(ep) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Letter from Steven Ray RE: Request for Status of Case (kpf) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Receipt of payment from STEVEN RAY in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 7/9/2019. Receipt number 333066568 processed by epetrosk. (jjs, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333066568. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ga) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Letter dtd 7/1/19 from Steven L. Ray RE: Filing fee (ao) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Petition for Compassionate Release by Steven L. Ray. (bg) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER denying #6 and (14) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, Mr. Ray shall forward to: "Clerk, U.S. District Court, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501," a check or money order in the amount of $ 5.00 payable to "Clerk, U.S. District Court." If this fee is received, the Court will screen Mr. Rays petition. If, however, Petitioner fails to pay the requisite filing fee, his petition will be dismissed without prejudice.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/28/2019 (bg) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Steven L. Ray. (ga) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven L. Ray.(ga) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred electronically in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06255. containing electronic documents. (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER. On May 22, 2019, Plaintiff filed a #8 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Courts Order denying bail in a separate criminal proceeding in this Court (US v. Ray, 15-CR-06004, #145). Plaintiff's motion is dated May 19, 2019 and was thus mailed to the Court prior to the Court's #7 Order filed May 22, 2019, transferring this action to the United States District Court, Middle District of Pennsylvania. Because the motion for reconsideration should have been filed only in the aforementioned criminal proceeding, the Clerk of Court is directed to remove the #8 MOTION for Reconsideration from the docket in this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 5/29/19. (PR)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Pursuant to 9 Text Order, this document is removed from the docket. MOTION for Reconsideration by Steven L. Ray. (JHF) Modified on 6/6/2019 (JHF). [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER transferring the petition to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Determination of Petitioner's requests for bail and motion to proceed in forma pauperis have been left to the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 5/20/19. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven L. Ray. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JUDGMENT administratively terminating the action. Signed by Clerk on 4/26/19. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER administratively terminating the action. If Petitioner wishes to reopen this action, he shall pay the filing fee of $5.00, or notify the Court in writing as directed no latter than 30 days from the date of this order. Clerk directed to send to Petitioner a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation and authorization form. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 4/24/19. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Compel by Steven L. Ray. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Steven L. Ray. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Steven L. Ray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JHF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2019: #2 Envelope) (JHF). [Transferred from New York Western on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.