This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2021 at 09:57:38 (UTC).

Ray v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Ray filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Auto-Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Regina M Rodriguez and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02444

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Regina M Rodriguez

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Ray

Defendant

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Anton Sirchio

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/27/2021. (amont, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#21

(#21) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 10/27/2021. Discovery due by 6/27/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2022. Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2022. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#19

(#19) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/26/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02444-RMR. (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#18

(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff and by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#16

(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#13

(#13) Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#12

(#15) ORDER finding as moot #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The extension of time has been granted 14 . By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/20/2021. Text Only Entry(skclc1) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

1 #11

USDC Cover Sheet

1 #10

State Court - Pre-Trial Order

1 #9

State Court - Delay Reduction Order

1 #8

State Court - Summons

1 #7

State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #6

State Court - Affidavit of Service

1 #5

State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time

1 #4

State Court - Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/27/2021. (amont, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 10/27/2021. Discovery due by 6/27/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2022. Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2022. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket(#20) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 10/26/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/26/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02444-RMR. (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff and by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02444-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER finding as moot #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The extension of time has been granted 14 . By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/20/2021. Text Only Entry(skclc1) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties may have up to and including October 25, 2021, to file a Proposed Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/20/2021. Text Only Entry (skclc1) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER Telephone Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a completed Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #6 ) shall be filed no later than seven calendar days before the conference.At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/16/2021. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Denver District Court Judge Darryl F. Shockley on 9/2/2021. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Eric Ray.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of service of Summons and Complaint for Auto-Owners Insurance Company on 8/10/2021. (mbrow, ) Modified to correct docket text on 9/10/2021 (cpomm, ). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Eric RayAttorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party Eric Ray(pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Arapahoe County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2021cv32333. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8065636), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 State Court - Complaint, #5 State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time, #6 State Court - Affidavit of Service, #7 State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #8 State Court - Summons, #9 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #10 State Court - Pre-Trial Order, #11 USDC Cover Sheet)(Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Bennett Stephenson