This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:13:57 (UTC).

Rawlins v. Wells Fargo Bank NA

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 Rawlins filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John E Ott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02055

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Ott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J Lay

Attorney at HOOD & LAY LLC

1117 South 22Nd Street

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew T Mitchell

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3100

Birmingham, AL 35203

Ryan Sikes Rummage

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Ste. 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) FINAL ORDER pursuant to the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal this action is DISMISSED without prejudice, costs taxed as paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/11/2020. (KAM) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend complaint Motion is RIPE 2/4/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr. (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Renew re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Mitchell, Matthew) Moot pursuant to 18 Modified on 2/5/2020 (KAM, ). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Leave to File to file amended complaint by Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr. (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr. (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Rummage, Ryan) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/3/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/30/2019. (BST) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 2/10/20 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 1/27/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/30/2019. (BST, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit 2

#5

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr. (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#3

(#4) TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 12/24/2019. (SUH) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3499423 (ALNd B4601102807) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank NA from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-901172, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KEK). (Mitchell, Matthew) Modified on 12/19/2019 (KEK). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FINAL ORDER pursuant to the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal this action is DISMISSED without prejudice, costs taxed as paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/11/2020. (KAM) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's #17 motion for extension of time to amend the complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff SHALL file the amended complaint by Monday, February 10, 2020. The #16 motion to renew the motion to dismiss is MOOT. The original #5 motion to dismiss is still pending before the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 02/05/2020. (SUH) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend complaint Motion is RIPE 2/4/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr. (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Renew re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Mitchell, Matthew) Moot pursuant to 18 Modified on 2/5/2020 (KAM, ). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's #14 motion for leave to file an amended complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff SHALL file his amended complaint by January 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 01/21/2020. (SUH) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to File to file amended complaint by Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr. (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr. (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER: The unopposed #11 motion to stay discovery pending resolution of the motion to dismiss is GRANTED. If any claims survive the motion to dismiss, the stay will be automatically lifted and the parties SHALL conduct their Rule 26(f) conference within twenty-one days of the order on the motion to dismiss and SHALL exchange initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) at least seven days before the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 01/14/2020. (SUH) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Rummage, Ryan) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Marvin Jody Rawlins, Jr, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/3/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/30/2019. (BST) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 2/10/20 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 1/27/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/30/2019. (BST, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: Before the undersigned is Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff SHALL respond to the motion by January 21, 2020 and Defendant may file a reply by January 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 12/28/2019. (SUH) (Entered: 12/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rummage, Ryan) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 12/24/2019. (SUH) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss Complaint Motion is RIPE 12/23/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Rummage, Ryan) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3499423 (ALNd B4601102807) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank NA from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-901172, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KEK). (Mitchell, Matthew) Modified on 12/19/2019 (KEK). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank NA from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-901172, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KEK) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.