This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 07:47:31 (UTC).

Ravin Crossbows, LLC v. Hunter's Manufacturing Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Ravin Crossbows, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hunter's Manufacturing Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elayna J. Youchah and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02213

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ravin Crossbows, LLC

Defendant

Hunter's Manufacturing Company, INC. doing business as Tenpoint Crossbow Technologies

Tenpoint Crossbow Technologies

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas J Santoro

Attorney at Santoro Whitmire

10100 W. Charelston Blvd., Suite 250

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Michelle Moran

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

777 E. Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5306

Kadie Jelenchick

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

777 E. Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5306

Jason D Smith

Attorney at Santoro Whitmire

10100 W. Charelston Blvd., Suite 250

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua D. Carlson

Attorney at Kemp Jones, LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, 17Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Nathanael R Rulis

Attorney at Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, 17Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

26 #3

Exhibit

26 #2

Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply

26 #1

Index

#26

(#26) MOTION For Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants Reply in Support of its #17 Motion to Transfer by Plaintiff Ravin Crossbows, LLC. Responses due by 2/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply, #3 Exhibit) (Jelenchick, Kadie) Modified event on 2/11/2022 (MR). (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#25

(#25) REPLY to Response to #19 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, by Defendant Hunter's Manufacturing Company, INC.. (Carlson, Joshua) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#24

(#24) REPLY to Response to #17 Motion to Change Venue by Defendant Hunter's Manufacturing Company, INC.. (Carlson, Joshua) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Defer Deadline for Responsive Pleading, ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant's Motion to Defer Deadline for Responsive Pleading, filed by Hunter's Manufacturing Company, INC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/4/2022.(Rulis, Nathanael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified event on 1/19/2022 (SLD). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

17 #1

Index Exhibits

#17

(#17) First MOTION to Change Venue. Responses due by 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibits) (Rulis, Nathanael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

1 #32

Summons

1 #31

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #24

Exhibit 19

1 #23

Exhibit 18

1 #22

Exhibit 17

1 #20

Exhibit 15

1 #7

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Appendix Vol II

1 #5

Exhibit 4

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION For Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants Reply in Support of its #17 Motion to Transfer by Plaintiff Ravin Crossbows, LLC. Responses due by 2/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply, #3 Exhibit) (Jelenchick, Kadie) Modified event on 2/11/2022 (MR). (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY to Response to #19 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, by Defendant Hunter's Manufacturing Company, INC.. (Carlson, Joshua) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY to Response to #17 Motion to Change Venue by Defendant Hunter's Manufacturing Company, INC.. (Carlson, Joshua) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiff Ravin Crossbows, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Jelenchick, Kadie) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE to #19 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, by Plaintiff Ravin Crossbows, LLC. Replies due by 2/8/2022. (Jelenchick, Kadie) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE to #17 Motion to Change Venue by Plaintiff Ravin Crossbows, LLC. Replies due by 2/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Jelenchick, Kadie) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Docket Correction to #19 filed by Nathanael Rulis. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Answer to Motion Miscellaneous. No further action is required. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Defer Deadline for Responsive Pleading, ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant's Motion to Defer Deadline for Responsive Pleading, filed by Hunter's Manufacturing Company, INC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/4/2022.(Rulis, Nathanael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified event on 1/19/2022 (SLD). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hunter's Manufacturing Company, INC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rulis, Nathanael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First MOTION to Change Venue. Responses due by 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibits) (Rulis, Nathanael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ravin Crossbows, LLC re #4 Summons Issued. Hunter's Manufacturing Company, INC. served on 12/22/2021. (Santoro, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings per 7 Minute Order. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-02213-GMN-EJY. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/20/2021. The Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2021-04, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated Patent Program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AO 120 - REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (KF) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kadie M. Jelenchick and Michelle A. Moran to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/31/2021. (no image attached) (KF) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hunter's Manufacturing Company, INC. re #1 Complaint. (KF) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (KF) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ravin Crossbows, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Other Affiliate CBCP Acquisition Corp., Other Affiliate CBCP Products, LLC, Other Affiliate Compass Diversified for Ravin Crossbows, LLC added. (Santoro, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hunter's Manufacturing Company, Inc. d/b/a TenPoint Crossbow Technologies (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6736399) by Ravin Crossbows, LLC. Proof of service due by 3/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Vol I, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Appendix Vol II, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10 (pt1), #13 Exhibit 10 (pt2), #14 Appendix Vol III, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12 (pt1), #17 Exhibit 12 (pt2), #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Civil Cover Sheet, #32 Summons) (Santoro, Nicholas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less