Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2021 at 11:10:04 (UTC).

Ravet v. Saul

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 Ravet filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela Pepper and William E Duffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01737

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Pamela Pepper

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick G Ravet

Defendant

Andrew M Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry A Schultz

Attorney at The Law Offices of Barry A Schultz PC

1601 Sherman Ave - Ste 500

Evanston, IL 60201

Defendant Attorneys

Social Security Administration

Attorney at United States Social Security Administration

600 W Madison St - 6Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60661-2474

Brian E Pawlak

Attorney at United States Department of Justice (ED-WI)

517 E Wisconsin Ave - Rm 530

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/16/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/16/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 2/8/2021 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 3/22/2021; defendant's response due 5/2/2021; plaintiff's reply due 5/17/2021. (cc: all counsel) (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Service (Schultz, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Patrick G Ravet. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schultz, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Patrick G Ravet. (Schultz, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Patrick G Ravet ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number BWIEDC-3641347) (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultz, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian E Pawlak