This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 08:03:04 (UTC).

RAVEN et al v. SCHREINER et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 RAVEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCHREINER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. KEARNEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00692

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. KEARNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAEL RAVEN

LOYOLA ENERGY, LLC

ELLICOTT, LLC

Defendants

MICHAEL AND BRENDA SCHREINER

BRENCO, OIL, INC.

LARRY ELKUS, ESQ., D/B/A LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C.

LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C.

LANCASTER EXPLORATION AND DEVELOPMENT CO., LLC

APPALACHIAN BASIN CPA'S, INC.

CHIEF EXPLORATION AND DEVELOPMENT

BRENCO OIL, INC.

DAVID T BUELE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARY SCHAFKOPF

Attorney at HOPKINS SCHAFKOPF, LLC

11 Bala Ave.

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

MATTHEW B. WEISBERG

Attorney at WEISBERG LAW PC

7 South Morton Ave

Morton, PA 19070

Defendant Attorneys

PETER NAKONECHNI

Attorney at Rubin, Fortunato & Harbison P.C.

1200 Liberty Ridge Drive, Suite 220

Wayne, PA 19087

THOMAS J. ZIMMERMAN

Attorney at KANE PUGH KNOELL TROY & KRAMER LLP

510 Swede St

Norristown, PA 19401

PAUL C. TROY

Attorney at KANE PUGH KNOELL AND DRISCOLL, L.L.P.

510 Swede Street

Norristown, PA 19401-4886

KEVIN JAMES MCKEON

Attorney at HAWKE MCKEON & SNISCAK LLP

100 N. 10Th Street

Harrisburg, PA 17101

SETH L. LAVER

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

1700 Market St Ste 1418

Philadelphia, PA 19103

GEORGE A. BIBIKOS

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES

17 North Second Street 18Th Fl

Harrisburg, PA 17101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A to H

1 #3

Exhibit I to P

1 #4

Case Management Track Form

1 #5

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by SETH L. LAVER on behalf of APPALACHIAN BASIN CPA'S, INC., DAVID T BUELE with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(LAVER, SETH) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL C. TROY on behalf of LARRY ELKUS, ESQ., D/B/A LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C., LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C. (TROY, PAUL) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT THE ELKUS DEFENDANTS SHALL, NO LATER THAN MARCH 2, 2022, EITHER: (1) STIPULATE TO REMAND WITH ALL DEFENDANTS CONSENT; (2) FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL PROPERLY PLEADING THE PARTIES CITIZENSHIP; OR (3) SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING SEVEN PAGES AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/24/22. 2/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va) Modified on 2/25/2022 (va). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) ORDER THE JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE #5 IS GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/1/2022.3/1/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPS BY CHAMBERS.(uh) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION by LARRY ELKUS, ESQ., D/B/A LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C., LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C.. (ZIMMERMAN, THOMAS) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER APPROVING #8 STIPULATION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH REMAND THIS CASE TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS FOR PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THE CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/3/22. 3/3/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #9 emailed/faxed to CCP Philadelphia County on 3/3/22. (va) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER APPROVING #8 STIPULATION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH REMAND THIS CASE TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS FOR PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THE CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/3/22. 3/3/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION by LARRY ELKUS, ESQ., D/B/A LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C., LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C.. (ZIMMERMAN, THOMAS) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#7) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (rf, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THE JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE #5 IS GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/1/2022.3/1/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPS BY CHAMBERS.(uh) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Document in Compliance with the Court's Order of February 24, 2022 (Doc. 4) filed by LARRY ELKUS, ESQ., D/B/A LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C., LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZIMMERMAN, THOMAS) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMailed doc. 4 to unreps. (er) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT THE ELKUS DEFENDANTS SHALL, NO LATER THAN MARCH 2, 2022, EITHER: (1) STIPULATE TO REMAND WITH ALL DEFENDANTS CONSENT; (2) FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL PROPERLY PLEADING THE PARTIES CITIZENSHIP; OR (3) SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING SEVEN PAGES AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/24/22. 2/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va) Modified on 2/25/2022 (va). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL C. TROY on behalf of LARRY ELKUS, ESQ., D/B/A LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C., LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C. (TROY, PAUL) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by SETH L. LAVER on behalf of APPALACHIAN BASIN CPA'S, INC., DAVID T BUELE with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(LAVER, SETH) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LARRY ELKUS, ESQ., D/B/A LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C., LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15744417), filed by LARRY ELKUS, ESQ., D/B/A LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C., LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M. ELKUS, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to H, #3 Exhibit I to P, #4 Designation Form, #5 Certificate of Service)(ZIMMERMAN, THOMAS) Modified on 2/24/2022 (nd). (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chief Exploration and Development LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SETH L. LAVER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS J. ZIMMERMAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul C. Troy Esq.