This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 01:20:01 (UTC).

Ravago Americas, LLC v. Ward

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Ravago Americas, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ward. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ewing Werlein, Jr and Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02524

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Ewing Werlein, Jr

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ravago Americas LLC

Defendant

John Ward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Nelson Drabble

Attorney at Gray Reed et al

1601 Elm St, Ste 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Darrell A. Clay

Attorney at Walter & Haverfield

3500 Tower At Erieview, 1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Erika C. Birg

Attorney at Nelson Mullins et al

201 17Th Street, Nw, Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Lucas A. Westby

201 17Th Street N.W., Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Ryan K. Todd

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Broad and Cassel

100 Se 3Rd Avenue, Ste 2700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Kristen W Kelly

Attorney at Gray Reed McGraw LLP

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Ste 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Ralph E. Cascarilla

Attorney at Walter & Haverfield

3500 Tower At Erieview, 1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Darrell Scott Funk

Attorney at Gray Reed McGraw

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Ste 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Oliver Benton Curtis, III

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

333 Se 2Nd Avenue, Suite 4500

Miami, FL 33131-2184

Chance Knight Decker

Attorney at Gray Reed McGraw, P.C.

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Ste 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Michael Antoine Ackal, III

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw LLP

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel John Ringquist

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos et al

1221 Mckinney St, Ste 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Harold M. Schwarz, III

142 Milford Drive

Hudson, OH 44236

Edward Burton Goolsby

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos et al

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Kathleen A. Hahner

Attorney at Stark & Knoll

3475 Ridgewood Road

Akron, OH 44333

John P. Susany

Attorney at Stark & Knoll

3475 Ridgewood Road

Akron, OH 44333

Joseph Y Ahmad

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney St, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010-2009

Julie A. Bickis

Attorney at Stark & Knoll

3475 Ridgewood Road

Akron, OH 44333

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Lynn N Hughes. All court settings are vacated Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (gclair, 4) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#45

(#45) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr.(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(marflores, 4) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

44 #1

*Restricted*

#44

(#44) Case transferred in from Ohio Northern. Case Number 1:18-cv-02924; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#43

(#43) Order of Transfer. Parties' agreed Motion (Related doc #42 ) is granted. Case is transferred to the Southern District of Texas. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/12/2019. (H,CM) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

42 #1

Proposed Order Order on Agreed Motion to Transfer

#42

(#42) Agreed Motion to Transfer case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas filed by Defendant John Ward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Agreed Motion to Transfer)(Bickis, Julie) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#41

(#41) Notice of Appearance of D. Scott Funk filed by Ravago Americas, LLC. (Funk, D.) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#40

(#40) Attorney Appearance of Kristen W. Kelly on behalf of Ravago Americas, LLC. (Kelly, Kristen) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit F-Cassel LinkedIn

1 #7

Exhibit E-Declaration of John Jorgensen Sylint

1 #6

Exhibit D-Aerial Picture of Baytown Facility in TX

1 #5

Exhibit C-Sep 2018 Calls from Vinmar

1 #4

Exhibit B-Call Logs b/w JW and KD Jun-Jul 2018

1 #3

Exhibit A-JW_Non-Solicitation and Confidentiality Agmt

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) Return of Service by personal service executed upon John Ward on 12/31/2018, filed on behalf of Ravago Americas, LLC Related document(s) #4 , #5 , #2 , #1 , #3 . (Cascarilla, Ralph) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Lynn N Hughes. All court settings are vacated Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (gclair, 4) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr.(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(marflores, 4) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Case transferred in from Ohio Northern. Case Number 1:18-cv-02924; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Order of Transfer. Parties' agreed Motion (Related doc #42 ) is granted. Case is transferred to the Southern District of Texas. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/12/2019. (H,CM) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Agreed Motion to Transfer case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas filed by Defendant John Ward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Agreed Motion to Transfer)(Bickis, Julie) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Notice of Appearance of D. Scott Funk filed by Ravago Americas, LLC. (Funk, D.) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Attorney Appearance of Kristen W. Kelly on behalf of Ravago Americas, LLC. (Kelly, Kristen) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Notice of Attorney Appearance by William N. Drabble on behalf of Ravago Americas, LLC. (Drabble, William) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to withdraw attorneys Erika Birg, Lucas Westby and Ryan Todd (Related Doc #38 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/10/2019.(H,CM) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Motion (and proposed order) by Erika C. Birg, Lucas A. Westby, and Ryan K. Todd to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff Ravago Americas, LLC. (Birg, Erika) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Motion to dismiss case for lack of an indispensable party, or alternatively, Motion to transfer venue filed by Defendant John Ward. (Susany, John). Added motion to transfer venue (S,HR). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Affidavit of Service of Preliminary Injunction filed by Ravago Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Preliminary Injunction)(Cascarilla, Ralph) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service by personal service executed upon John Ward on 12/31/2018, filed on behalf of Ravago Americas, LLC Related document(s) #4 , #5 , #2 , #1 , #3 . (Cascarilla, Ralph) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon John Ward. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,SR) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (S,SR) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion for preliminary injunction and incorporated memorandum of law filed by Plaintiff Ravago Americas, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Cascarilla, Ralph) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ravago Americas, LLC. (Cascarilla, Ralph) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Verification of James Duffy filed by Ravago Americas, LLC. Related document(s) #1 .(Cascarilla, Ralph) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint (Verified) against Ravago Americas, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9062485.. Filed by Ravago Americas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A-JW_Non-Solicitation and Confidentiality Agmt, #4 Exhibit B-Call Logs b/w JW and KD Jun-Jul 2018, #5 Exhibit C-Sep 2018 Calls from Vinmar, #6 Exhibit D-Aerial Picture of Baytown Facility in TX, #7 Exhibit E-Declaration of John Jorgensen Sylint, #8 Exhibit F-Cassel LinkedIn) (Cascarilla, Ralph) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.