This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2021 at 08:18:55 (UTC).

Raul v. Chiasma, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Raul filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Chiasma, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05693

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pinchas Raul

Defendants

Todd Foley

David Stack

John F. Thero

Chiasma, Inc.

John A. Scarlett

Roni Mamluk

Scott Minick

Bard Geesaman

Raj Kannan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua M. Lifshitz

Attorney at Lifshitz Law Firm, P.C.

1190 Broadway

Hewlett, NY 11557

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/2/2021) (rro) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21cv5510. Document filed by Pinchas Raul..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Chiasma, Inc., Todd Foley, Bard Geesaman, Raj Kannan, Roni Mamluk, Scott Minick, John A. Scarlett, David Stack, John F. Thero. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24741369)Document filed by Pinchas Raul..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/2/2021) (rro) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-05510-GHW. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 21cv5510. (pc) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21cv5510. Document filed by Pinchas Raul..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chiasma, Inc., Todd Foley, Bard Geesaman, Raj Kannan, Roni Mamluk, Scott Minick, John A. Scarlett, David Stack, John F. Thero. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24741369)Document filed by Pinchas Raul..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua M. Lifshitz