3:21-CV-01492
03/02/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Finance - Consumer Credit
Edward M. Chen
Kim Rattler
Demandforce, Inc.
MH Sub I, LLC
Chaim Shaun Setareh
Attorney at Setareh Law Group
9665 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 430
Beverly Hills, CA 90212
Farrah Grant
Attorney at Setareh Law Group
9665 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 430
Beverly Hills, CA 90212
Thomas Alistair Segal
Attorney at Setareh Law Group
9665 Wilshire Blvd.,Suite 430
Beverly Hills, CA 90212
Matthew I. Bobb
Attorney at Hunton & Williams LLP
550 S. Hope St., Ste. 2000
Los Angeles, CA 90071
Proposed Order
Stipulation in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Shoul
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Certificate/Proof of Service of Subsequent Documents
Declaration of Matthew I. Bobb in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal
Civil Cover Sheet
DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021) (Entered: 04/16/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) ORDER RELATING CASE. Case related to 20-cv-2444-EMC, Rattler v. MH Sub I, LLC et al, to be reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/16/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021) (Entered: 04/16/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket#Electronic filing error Re: #10 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Demandforce, Inc., MH Sub I, LLC. The Motion should be filed in the earliest case to be processed. Please re-file in its entirety in case no. 3:20-cv-02444-EMC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED (CIVIL L.R. 3-12 & 7-11) filed by Demandforce, Inc., MH Sub I, LLC. Responses due by 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (Civil L.R. 3-12 & 7-11), #2 Proposed Order)(Bobb, Matthew) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 5/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2012, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances:< /b< Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, May 20, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on March 11, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kim Rattler.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Demandforce, Inc., MH Sub I, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet and Defendants' Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Subsequent Documents)(Bobb, Matthew) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Demandforce, Inc., MH Sub I, LLC. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Demandforce, Inc., MH Sub I, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sesame Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent Indigo Intermediate Co. II, LLC, Other Affiliate IB Aggregator II L.P., Other Affiliate IB Management Aggregator LLC, Other Affiliate KKR Indigo Aggregator II L.P., Other Affiliate KKR Indigo Aggregator III L.P., Other Affiliate KKR Indigo Aggregator II GP LLC, Other Affiliate Sidley Investments LLC. MH Sub I, LLC, Other Affiliate KKR & Co. Inc. and Temasek Holdings (Private) Limited for MH Sub I, LLC; Corporate Parent Sesame Communications, Inc. for Demandforce, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Bobb, Matthew) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/16/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (FEDERAL QUESTION JURISDICTION) from Superior Court for the County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20057640. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15644244). Filed byDemandforce, Inc., MH Sub I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Matthew I. Bobb in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal)(Bobb, Matthew) (Filed on 3/2/2021) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
[-] Read Less