This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2022 at 09:34:14 (UTC).

Kim Rattler v. Amazon.com Services LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Kim Rattler filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Amazon com Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09060

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kim Rattler

Defendants

Amazon.com Services LLC

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Farrah Beverly Grant

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard Suie 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew P Frederick

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

1400 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Aleksandr Markelov

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

1400 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Kassia Ann Stephenson

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius

One Market Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kim Rattler, identifying Kim Rattler and Amazon.com Services LLC. (Setareh, Chaim) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/28/2022. (tj) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/17/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Kim Rattler, upon Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lai Saevang, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/21/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Kim Rattler. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC, served on November 18, 2021. (Frederick, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC, (Frederick, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Frederick, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV38482 Receipt No: ACACDC-32352043 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Initial Status Conference Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Amazon's Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Andrew P Frederick added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:dft))(Frederick, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less