This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2021 at 07:26:40 (UTC).

Rathbun et al v. Barretts Minerals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Rathbun filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Barretts Minerals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-03228

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gwendolyn Rathbun

John Edwin Rathbun

Defendants

Himmel Management Company, LLC

Chattem, Inc.

Block Drug Company, Inc.

Cyprus Mines Corporation

Safeway, Inc.

Block Drug Corporation

GlaxoSmithKline, LLC

Barretts Minerals, Inc.

Lucky Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Lee Amell

Sarah Gilson

Defendant Attorneys

William Lamar Coggshall

Juliana Salfiti

Lisa Lurline Oberg

Jennifer J. Lee

Alex Paul Catalona

Alexandra Ascione

Emily D Bergstrom

Ira D. Goldberg

James P. Cunningham

Ferlin Peregrino Ruiz

 

Court Documents

#50

49 #1

Proposed Order

#49

#48

26 #3

Certificate/Proof of Service

26 #2

Declaration

26 #1

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

#26

#22

#3

#2

1 #6

Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibits AAA-YYY to the Declaration of William L. Coggshall

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibits OO-ZZ to the Declaration of William L. Coggshall

1 #2

Exhibit Exhbits A-PP to the Declaration of William L. Coggshall

1 #1

Declaration Declaration of William L. Coggshall ISO Removal

#1

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Evidentiary Objections In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment to re #49 Reply to Opposition/Response by Lucky Stores, Inc.. (Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 6/17/2021) Modified on 6/21/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) REPLY (re #22 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byLucky Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) REPLY (re #26 First MOTION to Remand OF ACTION AND FOR AWARD OF COSTS ) filed byGwendolyn Rathbun, John Edwin Rathbun. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #26 First MOTION to Remand OF ACTION AND FOR AWARD OF COSTS ) filed byLucky Stores, Inc.. (Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #26 First MOTION to Remand OF ACTION AND FOR AWARD OF COSTS ) filed byChattem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Objections To Plaintiffs Evidence Provided In Support Of The Motion For Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration Of William L. Coggshall In Support Of Defendant Chattem, Inc.S Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Remand To State Court, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Coggshall, William) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byGwendolyn Rathbun, John Edwin Rathbun. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Hearing as to #22 MOTION for Summary Judgment, See Docket No. 44 : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Incorrect Event Used. In the future, the correct event is Opposition. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Motion a nd Related Filings > Responses and Replies. [err101] Re: #43 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Lucky Stores, Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Incorrect Event Used. In the future, the correct event is Ex Parte Application. Correct event is found under Civil Events > ; Motion and Related Filings & Motions- General. [err101] Re: #42 Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening), filed by Gwendolyn Rathbun, John Edwin Rathbun (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING Dkt. No. #42 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue the Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court CONTINUES the hearing on the Dkt. No. #22 Motion for Summary Judgment from August 26, 2021 to September 2, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. to be held along with the hearing on the Dkt. No. #26 Motion to Remand. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Ascione for Safeway, Inc. (Ascione, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/6/2021) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/18/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Chattem, Inc. Re #1 Removal filed by Chattem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Coggshall, William) (Filed on 5/4/2021) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet Rev. 10/20 from our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed . Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #5 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Chattem, Inc. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Civil Cover Sheet by Chattem, Inc. Re #1 Removal filed by Chattam, Inc.. (Coggshall, William) (Filed on 5/3/2021) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet Rev. 10/20 from our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submi t your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Chattem, Inc. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by William Lamar Coggshall (Coggshall, William) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chattem, Inc. (Coggshall, William) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Chattem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Chattem, Inc.. (Coggshall, William) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG20083508. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15913634). Filed byChattem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William L. Coggshall ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhbits A-PP to the Declaration of William L. Coggshall, #3 Exhibit Exhibits OO-ZZ to the Declaration of William L. Coggshall, #4 Exhibit Exhibits AAA-YYY to the Declaration of William L. Coggshall, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Coggshall, William) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less