This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 08:40:29 (UTC).

Rasulallah et al v. Smith & Nephew Inc

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Rasulallah filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Smith Nephew Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01143

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Rasulallah

Defendants

John Does

Smith & Nephew Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Willard Proctor, Jr.

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2500 South State Street

Little Rock, AR 72206-2162

Defendant Attorneys

Glen G. Reid, Jr.

Attorney at Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, LLP

6070 Poplar Avenue, Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38119

Robert Edgar Craddock, Jr.

Attorney at Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, LLP

6070 Poplar Avenue, Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38119

Matthew Mahoney Lubozynski

Attorney at Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, LLP

6070 Poplar Avenue, Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Rasulallah's complaint is dismissed without prejudice and (as requested) with leave to amend. Amended complaint due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/2020. (jak) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#10

(#10) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Response to Motion filed by Barbara Rasulallah. (Proctor, Willard) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barbara Rasulallah. (Proctor, Willard) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/17/2020. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/29/2020. (slb) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 Memorandum by Barbara Rasulallah (Proctor, Willard) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Smith & Nephew Inc (Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Smith & Nephew Inc (Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Barbara Rasulallah.(bmd) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith & Nephew Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60-CV-20-2875. Fee $400 received. Receipt number LIT079028. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Rasulallah's complaint is dismissed without prejudice and (as requested) with leave to amend. Amended complaint due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/2020. (jak) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Response to Motion filed by Barbara Rasulallah. (Proctor, Willard) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barbara Rasulallah. (Proctor, Willard) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/17/2020. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/29/2020. (slb) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. #6 , granted. Response due by 30 October 2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/16/2020. (slb) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 Memorandum by Barbara Rasulallah (Proctor, Willard) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Smith & Nephew Inc (Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Smith & Nephew Inc (Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Barbara Rasulallah.(bmd) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith & Nephew Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60-CV-20-2875. Fee $400 received. Receipt number LIT079028. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less