This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 14:07:31 (UTC).

Rastakhiz et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 Rastakhiz filed an Other lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01015

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rossie D. Alston, Jr

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abbas Rastakhiz

Roya Hosseini

Defendants

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Ur Mendoza Jaddou

Robert L. Daum

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Oliver Hacking, III

Attorney at Hacking Law Practice, LLC

10900 Manchester Rd, Ste 203

St. Louis, MO 63122-1200

Roya Vasseghi

Attorney at Vasseghi Budd PLLC

9663 Main Street Suite A, Fairfax

Fairfax, VA 22031

Defendant Attorneys

Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither

Attorney at Assistant US Atty

Po Box 61129

Houston, TX 77208

Lauren A. Wetzler

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (Alexandria)

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314

Peter B. Baumhart

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (Alexandria)

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDERED that the Motion (Dkt. 16) is GRANTED pending the adjudication of Plaintiffs' Forms I-589; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that while this matter is stayed, the Parties shall file status reports with this Court every sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/20/2022. (nneb) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

15 #1

Receipt

#15

(#15) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i) Acknowledgement filed by Roya Hosseini, Abbas Rastakhiz. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Set Responsive Pleading Deadline. Defendants may file an answer up and until October 13, 2022. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 09/30/2022. (dvanm) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION Set Responsive Pleading Deadline by Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter B. Baumhart on behalf of Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed James Oliver Hacking, III for Roya Hosseini. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 9/19/2022. (nneb) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#10

(#10) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James O. Hacking, III and Certification of Local Counsel Roya Vasseghi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8572264. by Roya Hosseini, Abbas Rastakhiz. (Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:22-cv-02417. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia by Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Resetting re: #3 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/29/2022 at 10:20 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/29/2022)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDERED that the Motion (Dkt. 16) is GRANTED pending the adjudication of Plaintiffs' Forms I-589; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that while this matter is stayed, the Parties shall file status reports with this Court every sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/20/2022. (nneb) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i) Acknowledgement filed by Roya Hosseini, Abbas Rastakhiz. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Set Responsive Pleading Deadline. Defendants may file an answer up and until October 13, 2022. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 09/30/2022. (dvanm) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION Set Responsive Pleading Deadline by Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter B. Baumhart on behalf of Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Baumhart, Peter) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed James Oliver Hacking, III for Roya Hosseini. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 9/19/2022. (nneb) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James O. Hacking, III and Certification of Local Counsel Roya Vasseghi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8572264. by Roya Hosseini, Abbas Rastakhiz. (Vasseghi, Roya) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotification of transfer from the Southern District of Texas Case No. 4:22-cv-02417 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (jlan) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:22-cv-02417. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Virginia. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 9/7/2022, filed. (kpicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia by Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Resetting re: #3 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/29/2022 at 10:20 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Roya Hosseini, Abbas Rastakhiz, filed.(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rguerrero, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 10:21 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Attorney General Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney U.S. Attorney Jennifer Lowery, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons Daum, #3 Summons Jaddou, #4 Summons USCIS)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert L. Daum, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28494851) filed by Abbas Rastakhiz, Roya Hosseini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter B. Baumhart

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren A. Wetzler