This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2022 at 07:44:01 (UTC).

Rashad et al v. Mason's Professional Cleaning Service, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 Rashad filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Mason's Professional Cleaning Service, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr and Tu M. Pham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02635

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Veronica Watts Rashad

Calvin Bell

Defendants

Mason's Professional Cleaning Service, LLC

Dorothy Mason

Eliot Mason

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff Veronica Watts Rashad's Consent to Join

1 #2

Exhibit B - Plaintiff Calvin Bell's Consent to Join

1 #3

Summons to be issued as to Defendant Mason's Professional Cleaning Service,

1 #4

Summons to be issued for Defendant Dorothy Mason

1 #5

Summons to be issued as to Defendant Eliot Mason

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Judge John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

summons

6 #2

summons

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Veronica Watts Rashad (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Veronica Watts Rashad Consent to Join Gregory Hullum (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Calvin Bell, Veronica Watts Rashad Consent to Join Miranda Walker (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Veronica Watts Rashad Consent to Join Carolyn Smith (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Watts Rashad, Calvin Bell as to All Defendants. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Watts Rashad, Calvin Bell as to All Defendants. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Veronica Watts Rashad Consent to Join Carolyn Smith (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Calvin Bell, Veronica Watts Rashad Consent to Join Miranda Walker (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Veronica Watts Rashad Consent to Join Gregory Hullum (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Veronica Watts Rashad (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Dorothy Mason, Eliot Mason, Mason's Professional Cleaning Service, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(jae) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (FLSA Collective Action) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3972816), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Veronica Watts Rashad's Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Calvin Bell's Consent to Join, #3 Summons to be issued as to Defendant Mason's Professional Cleaning Service, LLC, #4 Summons to be issued for Defendant Dorothy Mason, #5 Summons to be issued as to Defendant Eliot Mason, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Russ Bryant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Emmett Turner, IV