This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:33:02 (UTC).

Rarick v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Rarick filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Atrium Medical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jill Rarick

Defendants

Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC

Atrium Medical Corporation

Getinge AB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John J. Foley

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy

One Court St

Alton, IL 62002

Defendant Attorneys

Pierre A. Chabot

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

Enjolique D. Aytch

Attorney at Akerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Blvd, Ste 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Deadlines in CMO 3H filed by All Plaintiffs. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al. Follow up on Objection on 5/2/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hilliard, Russell) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 2/21/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aytch, Enjolique) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1774343 filed by Jill Rarick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foley, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Deadlines in CMO 3H filed by All Plaintiffs. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al. Follow up on Objection on 5/2/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hilliard, Russell) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 2/21/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aytch, Enjolique) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • MDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-185-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1774343 filed by Jill Rarick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foley, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.