This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 15:45:17 (UTC).

Raramuri Construction, Inc. v. Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Raramuri Construction, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01410

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raramuri Construction, Inc.

Defendants

MCP Build, Inc.

Multi-Family Framing, LLC

The Guarantee Company of North America

Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC d/b/a Residence Inn Steamboat Springs

Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Residence Inn Steamboat Springs

Guarantee Company of North America, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Brent Demmitt

Attorney at Sharp, Sherman & Engle, LLC

P.O. Box 774968, 401 Lincoln Avenue

Steamboat Springs, CO 80477-4608

Defendant Attorneys

Jerome M. Joseph

Attorney at Allen & Curry P.C.

1125 Seventeenth Street, Suite 1275

Denver, CO 80202

Daniela Laura Reichelstein

Attorney at Allen & Curry P.C.

1125 Seventeenth Street, Suite 1275

Denver, CO 80202

Theodore Allen Wells

Attorney at Allen & Curry P.C.

1125 Seventeenth Street, Suite 1275

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) REPLY to Response to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Demmitt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

18 #5

Exhibit D to Response to Plaintiff's Motion and Brief in Support o

18 #4

Exhibit C to Response to Plaintiff's Motion and Brief in Support o

18 #3

Exhibit B to Affidavit of Iver Retrum

18 #2

Exhibit A to Affidavit of Iver Retrum

18 #1

Affidavit of Iver Retrum

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Guarantee Company of North America, The, MCP Build, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Iver Retrum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit of Iver Retrum, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Iver Retrum, #4 Exhibit C to Response to Plaintiff's Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Remand, #5 Exhibit D to Response to Plaintiff's Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Remand)(Joseph, Jerome) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Demmitt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Demmitt, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit H - Email Correspondence from Guarantee

1 #7

Exhibit G - Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - 20210521 Register of Actions and Party Information

1 #5

Exhibit E - 20210401 Summons - MCP Build

1 #4

Exhibit D - 20210401 Summons - Pine Grove Hotel Venture

1 #3

Exhibit C - 20210401 Summons - Guarantee Company

1 #2

Exhibit B - 20210401 District Case Coversheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - 20210401 Complaint

#1

(#2) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by attorney Jerome M. Joseph.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#22) ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Routt County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 21-cv-01410-CMA-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/27/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/26/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Demmitt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket(#19) CASE REASSIGNED The deadline for parties to consent has lapsed. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01410-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (amont, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Guarantee Company of North America, The, MCP Build, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Iver Retrum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit of Iver Retrum, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Iver Retrum, #4 Exhibit C to Response to Plaintiff's Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Remand, #5 Exhibit D to Response to Plaintiff's Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Remand)(Joseph, Jerome) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: Plaintiff's #16 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify the Complaint does not comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(b). Therefore, the Motion is denied without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/2/2021. Text Only Entry(skclc1) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Demmitt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Demmitt, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER re #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. On May 25, 2021, Plaintiff's Counsel was notified that he would need to enter an appearance in this matter in order to receive any electronic service via the CM/ECF system. To be sure, in this District, represented parties are required to utilize the electronic filing system. Yet Counsel chose to wait until one month later to do so, and therefore, did not receive any of the filings, including Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Thus, while Defendant may have failed to provide a courtesy copy to Plaintiff, much of the responsibility for this current posture is due to Counsel's own delay. The Court does not perceive any nefarious behavior. Nevertheless, the Court will grant Plaintiff up to and including July 2, 2021, to file its response to the Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/30/2021. Text Only Entry(skclc1) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Guarantee Company of North America, The, MCP Build, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Hospital Discharge Papers)(Joseph, Jerome) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Summons - Pine Grove Hotel Venture, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service - Pine Grove Hotel, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, Notice of Exempt Offering of Securities, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Colorado Secretary of State - Summary - Pine Grove Hotel Venture, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order for Remand)(Demmitt, Thomas) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Brent Demmitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Thomas Brent Demmitt added to party Raramuri Construction, Inc.(pty:pla) (Demmitt, Thomas) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Guarantee Company of North America, The, MCP Build, Inc.. (Joseph, Jerome) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance to Assert Jurisdictional Insufficiency of Process; and Insufficiency of Service of Process by Jerome M. Joseph on behalf of Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC Attorney Jerome M. Joseph added to party Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC (pty:dft) (Joseph, Jerome) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT AND LIEN FORECLOSURE against Guarantee Company of North America, The, MCP Build, Inc., Multi-Family Framing, LLC, Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC, filed by Raramuri Construction, Inc..(alave, ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by attorney Jerome M. Joseph.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCP Build, Inc. from District Court, Routt County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2021CV030023. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7883630), filed by MCP Build, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 20210401 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 20210401 District Case Coversheet, #3 Exhibit C - 20210401 Summons - Guarantee Company, #4 Exhibit D - 20210401 Summons - Pine Grove Hotel Venture, #5 Exhibit E - 20210401 Summons - MCP Build, #6 Exhibit F - 20210521 Register of Actions and Party Information, #7 Exhibit G - Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit H - Email Correspondence from Guarantee)(Joseph, Jerome) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant