This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:24:26 (UTC).

Rapp v. ABTB Louisville LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Rapp filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ABTB Louisville LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg N. Stivers and Colin H. Lindsay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00700

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg N. Stivers

Referral Judge

Colin H. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shani Rapp

Defendants

ABTB Louisville LLC doing business as Taco Bell

Harvona Ould Mahfodh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kurt A. Scharfenberger

9000 Wessex Place, Suite 204

Louisville, KY 40222

Defendant Attorneys

Irina V. Strelkova

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, 32Nd Floor

Louisville, KY 40202-3363

Jennifer L. Bame

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, 32Nd Floor

Louisville, KY 40202-3363

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 1/5/2022. This matter is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. cc:counsel (JWM) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

8 #1

Order of Dismissal with Prejudice

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) Mail sent to Harvona Ould Mahfodh (DN #4 ) Returned as Undeliverable. (JWM) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 11/23/2021. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay will conduct at telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 1/11/2022 at 11:00 am EST. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2773744. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Parties shall conduct a meeting of the parties by 12/21/2021. Counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report by 1/4/2022. See Order for specifics. cc:counsel; TB-Case Manager (JWM) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court and Counsel/Parties, re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#3

(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit G cover page (filed in master case)

2 #2

Main Document

1 #7

Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - Summons - Return of Service

1 #5

Exhibit E - Affidavit of Babacar Diop

1 #4

Exhibit D - Jefferson Circuit Court Docket

1 #3

Exhibit C - Affidavit of James Vonderhaar

1 #2

Exhibit B - Copy of ABTB's Answer

1 #1

Exhibit A - Copy of the Cojmplaint, Summons, and all process, pleadings and orde

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 1/5/2022. This matter is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. cc:counsel (JWM) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal with Prejudice) by ABTB Louisville LLC. (Strelkova, Irina) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail sent to Harvona Ould Mahfodh (DN #4 ) Returned as Undeliverable. (JWM) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 11/23/2021. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay will conduct at telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 1/11/2022 at 11:00 am EST. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2773744. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Parties shall conduct a meeting of the parties by 12/21/2021. Counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report by 1/4/2022. See Order for specifics. cc:counsel; TB-Case Manager (JWM) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 11/23/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; TLB (TJD) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court and Counsel/Parties, re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint (Filed in Jefferson Circuit Court - See DN #1 -2.) by ABTB Louisville LLC. (CDF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ABTB OW LLC, Other Affiliate Orangewood ABDD Holding LLC, Other Affiliate SWN Taco LLC for ABTB Louisville LLC, by ABTB Louisville LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G cover page (filed in master case)) (CDF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-005859, filed by ABTB Louisville LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYWDC-3476045) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of the Complaint, Summons, and all process, pleadings and orders served upon ABTB, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of ABTB's Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of James Vonderhaar, #4 Exhibit D - Jefferson Circuit Court Docket, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Babacar Diop, #6 Exhibit F - Summons - Return of Service, #7 Cover Sheet) (CDF) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Bame