This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:09:48 (UTC).

Rapp et al v. NaphCare Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Rapp filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against NaphCare Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David G. Estudillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05800

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David G. Estudillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Rapp

Megan F Wabnitz

Judith Rapp

Defendants

NaphCare Inc

Kitsap County

Gary Simpson

John Gese

Mark Rufener

Jim McLane

Susanne Moore

Marsha Burges

Amber H Simpler

Jeffrey Alvarez

Bradford T McLane

Cornelius Henderson

Gina Savage

Odessa McCleary

Erica Molina

Brandon Rohde

Andrew Hren

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gabriel S Galanda

Attorney at GALANDA BROADMAN, PLLC

Po Box 15146

Seattle, WA 98115

Matthew Jacob Slovin

Attorney at GALANDA BROADMAN, PLLC

Po Box 15146

Seattle, WA 98115

Ryan David Dreveskracht

Attorney at GALANDA BROADMAN, PLLC

Po Box 15146

Seattle, WA 98115

Defendant Attorneys

David Joseph Corey

Attorney at HELSELL FETTERMAN LLP (SEA)

1001 4Th Ave, Ste 4200

Seattle, WA 98154-1154

Debra M Akhbari

Attorney at HELSELL FETTERMAN LLP (SEA)

1001 4Th Ave, Ste 4200

Seattle, WA 98154-1154

Christine M. Palmer

Attorney at KITSAP COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

614 Division St, Ms-35A

Port Orchard, WA 98366-7148

Ione S George

Attorney at KITSAP COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

614 Division St, Ms-35A

Port Orchard, WA 98366-7148

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on NaphCare Inc. on 12/7/2021, filed by Plaintiffs John Rapp, Judith Rapp, Megan F Wabnitz. (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jeffrey Alvarez mailed on 12/10/2021; Marsha Burges mailed on 12/10/2021; Cornelius Henderson mailed on 12/10/2021; Bradford T McLane mailed on 12/10/2021; Jim McLane mailed on 12/10/2021; Susanne Moore mailed on 12/10/2021; Gina Savage mailed on 12/10/2021; Amber H Simpler mailed on 12/10/2021 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Elvia Decker mailed on 12/9/2021; John Gese mailed on 12/9/2021; Andrew Hren mailed on 12/9/2021; Merile Montgomery mailed on 12/9/2021; Jerry Randall mailed on 12/9/2021; Brandon Rohde mailed on 12/9/2021; Mark Rufener mailed on 12/9/2021; Gary Simpson mailed on 12/9/2021 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Debra M Akhbari on behalf of Defendants Jeffrey Alvarez, Marsha Burges, Cornelius Henderson, Bruce Karl, Haven Ladusta, Odessa McCleary, Bradford T McLane, Jim McLane, Erica Molina, Susanne Moore, Scott Moran, Ripsy A Nagra, NaphCare Inc, Alanna Sandack, Gina Savage, Amber H Simpler. (Akhbari, Debra) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Joseph Corey on behalf of Defendants Jeffrey Alvarez, Marsha Burges, Cornelius Henderson, Bruce Karl, Haven Ladusta, Odessa McCleary, Bradford T McLane, Jim McLane, Erica Molina, Susanne Moore, Scott Moran, Ripsy A Nagra, NaphCare Inc, Alanna Sandack, Gina Savage, Amber H Simpler. (Corey, David) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#7

(#7) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Kitsap County on 11/15/2021 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ione S George on behalf of Defendant Kitsap County. (George, Ione) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christine M. Palmer on behalf of Defendant Kitsap County. (Palmer, Christine) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/24/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/31/2022. Signed by Hon. David G. Estudillo. (MGC) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

3 #22

Summons - Nagra

3 #21

Summons - Ladusta

3 #20

Summons - Sandack

3 #19

Summons - Moran

3 #11

Summons - Henderson

3 #9

Summons - Alvarez

3 #7

Summons - Burges

3 #6

Summons - Moore

3 #3

Summons - Gese

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on NaphCare Inc. on 12/7/2021, filed by Plaintiffs John Rapp, Judith Rapp, Megan F Wabnitz. (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jeffrey Alvarez mailed on 12/10/2021; Marsha Burges mailed on 12/10/2021; Cornelius Henderson mailed on 12/10/2021; Bradford T McLane mailed on 12/10/2021; Jim McLane mailed on 12/10/2021; Susanne Moore mailed on 12/10/2021; Gina Savage mailed on 12/10/2021; Amber H Simpler mailed on 12/10/2021 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Elvia Decker mailed on 12/9/2021; John Gese mailed on 12/9/2021; Andrew Hren mailed on 12/9/2021; Merile Montgomery mailed on 12/9/2021; Jerry Randall mailed on 12/9/2021; Brandon Rohde mailed on 12/9/2021; Mark Rufener mailed on 12/9/2021; Gary Simpson mailed on 12/9/2021 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Debra M Akhbari on behalf of Defendants Jeffrey Alvarez, Marsha Burges, Cornelius Henderson, Bruce Karl, Haven Ladusta, Odessa McCleary, Bradford T McLane, Jim McLane, Erica Molina, Susanne Moore, Scott Moran, Ripsy A Nagra, NaphCare Inc, Alanna Sandack, Gina Savage, Amber H Simpler. (Akhbari, Debra) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Joseph Corey on behalf of Defendants Jeffrey Alvarez, Marsha Burges, Cornelius Henderson, Bruce Karl, Haven Ladusta, Odessa McCleary, Bradford T McLane, Jim McLane, Erica Molina, Susanne Moore, Scott Moran, Ripsy A Nagra, NaphCare Inc, Alanna Sandack, Gina Savage, Amber H Simpler. (Corey, David) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Kitsap County on 11/15/2021 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ione S George on behalf of Defendant Kitsap County. (George, Ione) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christine M. Palmer on behalf of Defendant Kitsap County. (Palmer, Christine) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/24/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/31/2022. Signed by Hon. David G. Estudillo. (MGC) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Jeffrey Alvarez, Marsha Burges, Elvia Decker, John Gese, Cornelius Henderson, Andrew Hren, Bruce Karl, Kitsap County, Amanda LaCombe, Haven Ladusta, Odessa McCleary, Bradford T McLane, Jim McLane, Erica Molina, Merile Montgomery, Susanne Moore, Scott Moran, Ripsy A Nagra, NaphCare Inc, Jerry Randall, Brandon Rohde, Mark Rufener, Alanna Sandack, Gina Savage, Amber H Simpler, Gary Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Kitsap County, #2 Summons - Simpson, #3 Summons - Gese, #4 Summons - Rufener, #5 Summons - Jim McLane, #6 Summons - Moore, #7 Summons - Burges, #8 Summons - Simpler, #9 Summons - Alvarez, #10 Summons - Bradford McLane, #11 Summons - Henderson, #12 Summons - Savage, #13 Summons - McCleary, #14 Summons - Molina, #15 Summons - Rohde, #16 Summons - Hren, #17 Summons - Decker, #18 Summons - Karl, #19 Summons - Moran, #20 Summons - Sandack, #21 Summons - Ladusta, #22 Summons - Nagra, #23 Summons - LaCombe, #24 Summons - Randall, #25 Summons - Montgomery)(AMD) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketHon. David G. Estudillo added. (AMD) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs John Rapp, Judith Rapp, Megan Wabnitz (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons)(Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7311280), filed by John Rapp, Judith Rapp, Megan Wabnitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kitsap County is a litigant

Latest cases where Naphcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine M. Palmer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ione S George