This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2023 at 07:46:56 (UTC).

Raphael v. Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 Raphael filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Underwriters at Lloyd's London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael North and Susie Morgan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04534

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael North

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lilliana Raphael

Defendant

Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Interested Party

Hurricane Ida Program Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Galen M. Hair

Lauren E. Checki

Defendant Attorneys

Virginia Y. Dodd

Ebony Shadae Morris

Kevin W. Welsh

Interested Party Attorney

Francis Joseph Lobrano

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Underwriters at Lloyd's London (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9659605) filed by Lilliana Raphael. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Lauren E. Checki added to party Lilliana Raphael(pty:pla).(Checki, Lauren) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#3

(#3) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(cs) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (cs) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Underwriters at Lloyd's London served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Checki, Lauren) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Ebony Shadae Morris added to party Underwriters at Lloyd's London(pty:dft).(Morris, Ebony) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall be granted an extension of time through January 5, 2023, to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/19/2022. (pp) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 12/20/22 Order, #2 Case List)(lag) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

8 #1

12/20/22 Order

8 #2

Case List

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Underwriters at Lloyd's London.(Morris, Ebony) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#11

(#11) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Underwriters at Lloyd's London identifying corporate Parent(s) Lloyd's Syndicate 33, Lloyd's Syndicate 2003, Lloyd's Syndicate 5886. (Morris, Ebony) Modified text on 1/11/2023 (pp). (Entered: 01/10/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Underwriters at Lloyd's London identifying corporate Parent(s) Lloyd's Syndicate 33, Lloyd's Syndicate 2003, Lloyd's Syndicate 5886. (Morris, Ebony) Modified text on 1/11/2023 (pp). (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Underwriters at Lloyd's London.(Morris, Ebony) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 12/20/22 Order, #2 Case List)(lag) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall be granted an extension of time through January 5, 2023, to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/19/2022. (pp) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Ebony Shadae Morris added to party Underwriters at Lloyd's London(pty:dft).(Morris, Ebony) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Underwriters at Lloyd's London served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Checki, Lauren) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (cs) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(cs) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (mb) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Underwriters at Lloyd's London (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9659605) filed by Lilliana Raphael. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Lauren E. Checki added to party Lilliana Raphael(pty:pla).(Checki, Lauren) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less