This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 08:18:09 (UTC).

RANTON v. QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 RANTON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Renee Marie Bumb and Matthew J. Skahill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02636

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

Referral Judge

Matthew J. Skahill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAMIRRA RANTON

Defendants

QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC

JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, FICTITIOUS PERSONS

ABC CORP. 1-10, FICTITIOUS ENTITIES

JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10

ABC CORP. 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KEITH J. GENTES

Attorney at MALAMUT & ASSOCIATES, LLC

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 500

Cherry Hill, NJ 08003

MARK ROBERT NATALE

Attorney at MALAMUT & ASSOCIATES LLC

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 500

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL T. HENSLEY

Attorney at BRESSLER, AMERY & ROSS, P.C.

325 Columbia Turnpike

Florham Park, NJ 07932

ANDREA LAURA BONVICINO

Attorney at BRESSLER, AMERY & ROSS P.C.

325 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 301

Florham Park, NJ 07932-1007

JORKEELL ECHEVERRIA

Attorney at Bressler Amery & Ross, PC

325 Columbia Turnpike

Florham Park, NJ 07932

LAUREN E. FENTON-VALDIVIA

Attorney at BRESSLER, AMERY & ROSS, P.C.

325 Columbia Turnpike

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JORKEELL ECHEVERRIA on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC (ECHEVERRIA, JORKEELL) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (HENSLEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA LAURA BONVICINO on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC (BONVICINO, ANDREA) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. FENTON-VALDIVIA on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC (FENTON-VALDIVIA, LAUREN) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. GENTES on behalf of TAMIRRA RANTON (GENTES, KEITH) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. GENTES on behalf of TAMIRRA RANTON (GENTES, KEITH) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. FENTON-VALDIVIA on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC (FENTON-VALDIVIA, LAUREN) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA LAURA BONVICINO on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC (BONVICINO, ANDREA) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (HENSLEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 filed by MICHAEL T. HENSLEY on 5/4/2022 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (jab) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JORKEELL ECHEVERRIA on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC (ECHEVERRIA, JORKEELL) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketJudge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey - Camden County, case number CAM-L-1102-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13388118), filed by QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(HENSLEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quest Diagnostics Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL T. HENSLEY