This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2021 at 09:02:23 (UTC).

RANTILLA et al v. STRYKER CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 RANTILLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STRYKER CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joy Flowers Conti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01172

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joy Flowers Conti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARBARA S. RANTILLA

ROY RANTILLA

Defendants

STRYKER CORPORATION

HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.

HYPERBRANCH MEDICAL TECH, INC.

NOVADAQ INDUSTRIES

STRYKER FOOT & ANKLE

STRYKER NEUROVASCULAR

STRYKER ORTHOPADICS

STRYKER ORTHOPAEDICS

STRYKER ORTHOPEDICS

STRYKER TREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dallas M. Hartman

Attorney at Dallas W. Hartman, P.C.

201 Green Ridge Road

New Castle, PA 16105

Defendant Attorney

Stephen J. Finley

Attorney at Gibbons P.C.

One Logan Square

130 N. 18Th Street, SU 1210

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by STRYKER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (Finley, Stephen) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

3 #2

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by STRYKER CORPORATION. (Finley, Stephen) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by STRYKER CORPORATION. (Finley, Stephen) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by STRYKER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (Finley, Stephen) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying Stryker Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STRYKER CORPORATION. (Finley, Stephen) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/9/2021. (sdp) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mercer county, case number 2021-1901 with JURY DEMAND Copies attached: state court record (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6687670), filed by STRYKER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRYKER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. is a litigant