This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2020 at 11:34:33 (UTC).

Ranson et al v. Magellan Health Incorporated

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Ranson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Magellan Health Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael T Liburdi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01350

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael T Liburdi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel Ranson

Teresa Culberson

Mitchell Flanders

Joseph Rivera

Defendant

Magellan Health Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick A Barthle

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan Complex Litigation Group - Tampa, FL

201 N Franklin St., 7Th Fl.

Tampa, FL 33602

Carrie Ann Laliberte

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC - Phoenix, AZ

2325 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Patricia Nicole Syverson

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC - San Diego, CA

600 W Broadway, Ste. 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Martin A Ramey

Attorney at Rhine Law Firm PC

1612 Military Cutoff Rd., St. 300

Wilmington, NC 28403

John A Yanchunis

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan Complex Litigation Group - Tampa, FL

201 N Franklin St., 7Th Fl.

Tampa, FL 33602

Michael K Yarnoff

Attorney at Kehoe Law Firm PC

Two Penn Center Plaza, 1500 Jfk Blvd., Ste. 1020

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Michael Dell'Angelo

Attorney at Berger & Montague PC

1818 Market St., Ste. 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Elaine Ann Ryan

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC - Phoenix, AZ

2325 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Joel Robert Rhine

Attorney at Rhine Law Firm PC

1612 Military Cutoff Rd., St. 300

Wilmington, NC 28403

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren A Shoor

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP- Los Angeles, CA

555 S Flower St., 41St Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Eva Y Yang

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP- Los Angeles, CA

555 S Flower St., 41St Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jeffrey B Margulies

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP- Los Angeles, CA

555 S Flower St., 41St Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketRemark: Out of state attorney Patrick A Barthle removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael K Yarnoff on behalf of Plaintiffs Teresa Culberson, Mitchell Flanders, Daniel Ranson, Joseph Rivera. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Teresa Culberson, Mitchell Flanders, Daniel Ranson, Joseph Rivera: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 7/17/2020 to Magellan Health Inc. . (Laliberte, Carrie) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joel Robert Rhine and Martin A Ramey on behalf of Plaintiffs Teresa Culberson, Mitchell Flanders, Daniel Ranson, and Joseph Rivera. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael Dell'Angelo on behalf of Plaintiffs Teresa Culberson, Mitchell Flanders, Daniel Ranson, and Joseph Rivera. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Eva Y Yang on behalf of Defendant Magellan Health Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jeffrey B Margulies, Lauren A Shoor on behalf of Defendant Magellan Health Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John A Yanchunis on behalf of Plaintiffs Teresa Culberson, Mitchell Flanders, Daniel Ranson, Joseph Rivera. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18455907. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T. Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01350-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18455907 filed by Joseph Rivera, Teresa Culberson, Daniel Ranson, Mitchell Flanders. (submitted by Carrie Laliberte) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAGELLAN HEALTH, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Margulies