This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2021 at 07:26:37 (UTC).

Ranging Optics, LLC v. Leica Camera AG et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Ranging Optics, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Leica Camera AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christina A. Snyder and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07245

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ranging Optics, LLC

Defendants

Leica Camera AG

Leica Camera Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven W Ritcheson

Attorney at Insight PLC

578 Washington Boulevard No 503

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Defendant Attorney

Raija J Horstman

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

515 South Flower Street 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT LEICA CAMERA INC.S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 60 DAYS, #15 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS HEREBYORDERED that the joint stipulation is GRANTED in its entirety. Leica CameraInc.s responsive pleading shall be due on December 20, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

15 #1

Proposed Order

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-11658 CAS(PDx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07245 CAS(PDx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Leica Camera Inc. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Leica Camera AG. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT LEICA CAMERA INC.S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 60 DAYS, #15 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS HEREBYORDERED that the joint stipulation is GRANTED in its entirety. Leica CameraInc.s responsive pleading shall be due on December 20, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 20, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Leica Camera Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Raija J Horstman added to party Leica Camera Inc.(pty:dft))(Horstman, Raija) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-11658 CAS(PDx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07245 CAS(PDx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Leica Camera Inc. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Leica Camera AG. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) [Request to Issue Summons] Filed as Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Ranging Optics, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) Modified on 9/10/2021 (car). (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) [Request to Issue Summons] Filed as Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Ranging Optics, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) Modified on 9/10/2021 (car). (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ranging Optics, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Ranging Optics, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Ranging Optics, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31954383 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ranging Optics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney Steven W Ritcheson added to party Ranging Optics, LLC(pty:pla))(Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEICA CAMERA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raija J Horstman