This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2020 at 08:09:22 (UTC).

Randall v. Byrne et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Randall filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Byrne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02287

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diana Randall

Defendants

Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.

Patrick M. Byrne

Jonathan E. Johnson, III

Barclay F. Corbus

Gregory J. Iverson

Allison H. Abraham

Saum Noursalehi

Nominal Defendant

Overstock.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan M. Ernst

Attorney at O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC

824 N. Market Street, Suite 1001A

Wilmington, DE 19801

Gregory M. Nespole

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Verification

#2

#3

#3

3 #1

Certification of Gregory M. Nespole

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE FILED IN LEAD CASE NO. 1:19-CV-2182-CFC Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02182-CFC, 1:19-cv-02287-CFC(fms) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase associated with lead case: Create association to 1:19-cv-02182-CFC. (fms) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SO ORDERED, re (4 in 1:19-cv-02287-CFC, 3 in 1:19-cv-02182-CFC) Stipulation to Consolidate Related Derivative Actions and Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Diana Randall, David Gunaseelan. The files of the Consolidated Derivative Action will be maintained in one file under Lead Case No. 1: 19-cv-02182. See stipulation for further details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/21/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02182-CFC, 1:19-cv-02287-CFC(fms) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION to Consolidate Related Derivative Actions and Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel by David Gunaseelan, Diana Randall. (Ernst, Ryan) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory M. Nespole for Diana Randall added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory M. Nespole filed by Diana Randall. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/3/2020. (fms) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory M. Nespole - filed by Diana Randall. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gregory M. Nespole)(Ernst, Ryan) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (apk) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Allison H. Abraham, Patrick M. Byrne, Barclay F. Corbus, Gregory J. Iverson, Jonathan E. Johnson, III, Saum Noursalehi, Overstock.com, Inc., Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2804051.) - filed by Diana Randall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Verification)(apk) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Overstock.com is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M Nespole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Ernst