This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2022 at 07:39:49 (UTC).

RAMZIDDIN v. CHECKR, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 RAMZIDDIN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CHECKR, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi, Tonianne J. Bongiovanni and Georgette Castner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01323

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

Presiding Judges

Zahid N. Quraishi

Georgette Castner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABUSSAMAA RASUL RAMZIDDIN

Pennington, NJ 08534

Defendants

CHECKR, INC.

GRUBHUB

UBER

UBER EATS

CORNERSHOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOHN GEORGE PAPIANOU

Attorney at MONTGOMERY MCCRAKEN WALKER & RHOADS LLP

1735 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits

1 #2

Certification Certification of John G. Papianou

1 #3

Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement

#2

(#2) Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jal, ) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of proof of service filed by ABUSSAMAA RASUL RAMZIDDIN (abr, ) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHECKR, INC. identifying Checkr Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION and Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by CHECKR, INC.. (PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Defendant Checkr, Inc to respond to Complaint until 4/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/15/2022. (abr, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by ABUSSAMAA RASUL RAMZIDDIN. (abr, ) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 5/16/2022 before Judge Georgette Castner. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, ) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by ABUSSAMAA RASUL RAMZIDDIN. (abr, ) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketText Order (ECF No. 7) mailed to Plaintiff. (gxh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Georgette Castner for all further proceedings. Judge Zahid N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/12/2022. (gxh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Defendant Checkr, Inc to respond to Complaint until 4/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/15/2022. (abr, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION and Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by CHECKR, INC.. (PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHECKR, INC. identifying Checkr Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of proof of service filed by ABUSSAMAA RASUL RAMZIDDIN (abr, ) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jal, ) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of removal #1 filed by CHECKR, INC. on 3/11/2022 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (jal, ) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketJudge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, ) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHECKR, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Mercer County, case number MER-L-001850-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13249041), filed by CHECKR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Certification Certification of John G. Papianou, #3 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Checkr, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GRUBHUB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John G Papianou