This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:41:33 (UTC).

Ramus et al v. CSK Auto, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Ramus filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CSK Auto, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J. Hluchaniuk and David M. Lawson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10028

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael J. Hluchaniuk

Presiding Judge

David M. Lawson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Phillip Ramus

Cassandra Ramus

Defendants

O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC

CSK Auto, Inc.

Clifford Alan Wade

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David J. Nickola

Attorney at Nickola Assoc.

1015 Church Street, Suite 300

Flint, MI 48502

Defendant Attorney

Rhonda R. Stowers

Attorney at Plunkett & Cooney

111 E. Court Street, Suite 1B

Flint, MI 48502

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC identifying Corporate Parent O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., Other Affiliate CSK Auto, Inc., Other Affiliate Ozark Services, Inc. for O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Stowers, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#7

(#7) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Nickola, David) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 19-175837-NI. Receipt No: 0645-7548158 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stowers, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER striking improper filings. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Nickola, David) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC identifying Corporate Parent O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., Other Affiliate CSK Auto, Inc., Other Affiliate Ozark Services, Inc. for O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Stowers, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER striking improper filings. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 02/04/20 ORDER] OBJECTION to Notice of Filing of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Nickola, David) Modified on 2/5/2020 (DPer). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 02/04/20 ORDER] RESPONSE to Notice of Filing of Removal filed by Cassandra Ramus, Phillip Ramus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Nickola, David) Modified on 2/5/2020 (DPer). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 19-175837-NI. Receipt No: 0645-7548158 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stowers, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.