This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2019 at 07:47:20 (UTC).

Ramsey v. Limestone County, Alabama et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Ramsey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Limestone County, Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Herman N Johnson, Jr and Abdul K Kallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00070

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Herman N Johnson, Jr

Abdul K Kallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leslie Ramsey

Defendants

Limestone County, Alabama

Sheriff Mike Blakely

Fred Sloss

The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip M DeFatta

Attorney at WATSON MCKINNEY LLP

203 Greene Street

Huntsville, AL 35801

Rebekah Keith McKinney

Attorney at WATSON MCKINNEY LLP

200 Clinton Avenue, West Suite 110

Huntsville, AL 35801

Defendant Attorneys

Robert C Lockwood

Attorney at WILMER & LEE PA

100 Washington Street, Suite 200, P O Box 2168

Huntsville, AL 35804

T Mark Maclin

Attorney at WILMER & LEE PA

315 West Market Street, P O Box 710

Athens, AL 35612

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/1/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 2:15 PM; Jury Trial set for 9/7/2020 at 9:00 AM; BOTH in US Post Office & Courthouse, Decatur, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/1/12019. (AFS) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 5:19-cv-00070-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Judge Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C Lockwood on behalf of All Defendants (Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by no later than March 22, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/6/19. (BJL) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 3/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/6/19. (BJL) Modified on 2/25/2019 (BJL). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/6/19. (BJL) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mike Blakely, Limestone County, Alabama, Fred Sloss, The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama.(Maclin, T) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by T Mark Maclin on behalf of Mike Blakely, Limestone County, Alabama, Fred Sloss, The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama (Maclin, T) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed: The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (BJL) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Limestone County, Alabama served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. Sheriff Mike Blakely served; no delivery date given on green card. (BJL) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fred Sloss with no delivery date given on green card by Leslie Ramsey. (BJL) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Mike Blakely, Limestone County, Alabama, Fred Sloss, and The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Leslie Ramsey. (BJL) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mike Blakely, Limestone County, Alabama, Fred Sloss, and The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama.(BJL) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/1/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 2:15 PM; Jury Trial set for 9/7/2020 at 9:00 AM; BOTH in US Post Office & Courthouse, Decatur, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/1/12019. (AFS) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • (#15) TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for March 7, 2019 at 9:30 am is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/25/19. (BJL) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 5:19-cv-00070-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Judge Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C Lockwood on behalf of All Defendants (Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by no later than March 22, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/6/19. (BJL) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 3/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/6/19. (BJL) Modified on 2/25/2019 (BJL). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/6/19. (BJL) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mike Blakely, Limestone County, Alabama, Fred Sloss, The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama.(Maclin, T) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by T Mark Maclin on behalf of Mike Blakely, Limestone County, Alabama, Fred Sloss, The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama (Maclin, T) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed: The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (BJL) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Limestone County, Alabama served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. Sheriff Mike Blakely served; no delivery date given on green card. (BJL) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fred Sloss with no delivery date given on green card by Leslie Ramsey. (BJL) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Mike Blakely, Limestone County, Alabama, Fred Sloss, and The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 226433 (receipt number H4601003871). (BJL) Modified on 1/14/2019 (BJL). (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Leslie Ramsey. (BJL) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mike Blakely, Limestone County, Alabama, Fred Sloss, and The County Commission of Limestone County, Alabama.(BJL) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less