This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2021 at 07:02:30 (UTC).

Ramrod Licensing LLC v. AT&T, Inc.

Case Summary

On March 31, 2021, Ramrod Licensing LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Neal Massand of Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC filed an intellectual property lawsuit against AT&T, Inc. (“Defendant”) seeking accounting of all the damages and appropriate damages thereon and other reliefs for alleged infringement of technology relating to Methods and systems for transmitting video messages to mobile communication devices owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding.

In their complaint, Plaintiff alleged that “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ‘427 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the chart incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the ‘427 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the “Exemplary ‘427 Patent Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the ‘427 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers,” and “Defendant also has and continues to directly infringe, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Exemplary ‘427 Patent Claims, by having its employees internally test and use these Exemplary Products. The service of this Complaint upon Defendant constitutes actual knowledge of infringement as alleged here.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Despite such actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ‘427 Patent. On information and belief, Defendant has also continued to sell the Exemplary Defendant Products and distribute product literature and website materials inducing end users and others to use its products in the customary and intended manner that infringes the ‘427 Patent. Thus, on information and belief, Defendant is contributing to and/or inducing the infringement of the 427 Patent.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendant actively, knowingly, and intentionally has been and continues materially contribute to their own customers’ infringement of the ‘427 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ‘427 Patent. Moreover, the Exemplary Defendant Products are not a staple article of commerce suitable for substantial non-infringing use.”

The Plaintiff also alleged that “Defendant actively, knowingly, and intentionally has been and continues to induce infringement of the ‘427 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ‘427 Patent.”

The only claim for relief laid down by Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the ‘427 Patent. 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to order an accounting of all the damages, appropriate damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284 for Defendant’s past infringement, and adequate compensation if necessary along with costs of litigation. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.





Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00117

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramrod Licensing LLC

Defendants

AT&T, Inc.

AT&T Mobility LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neal Massand

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Stevenson Moore, V

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Brett Christopher Govett

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3600

Dallas, TX 75201

Henry Leon (Lon) Outland, III

Attorney at AT&T Services Inc - Dallas

208 S. Akard Street

Whitacre Tower, SUIT 3104

Matthew Sean Yungwirth

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Glenn D Richeson

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Atlanta

1075 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

Joseph Andrew Powers

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - PA

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Nicolette Joscelyn Zulli

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Houston

1330 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#31

#30

29 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#29

#28

27 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#27

25 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#25

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

#1

35 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #29 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant are DISMISSEDWITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/22/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Ramrod Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Massand, Neal) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #27 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that the stay of all deadlines is extended up to and including September 22, 2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/08/2021. (klc, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Agreed MOTION to Stay by Ramrod Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Massand, Neal) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/6/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Agreed MOTION to Stay by Ramrod Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Massand, Neal) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 7/15/2021. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked if they consented to a trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave the parties Markman and Jury Selection dates. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (aeb) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicolette Joscelyn Zulli on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Zulli, Nicolette) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T, Inc..( Govett, Brett) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Leon (Lon) Outland, III on behalf of AT&T, Inc. (Outland, Henry) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Christopher Govett on behalf of AT&T, Inc. (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramrod Licensing LLC. AT&T, Inc. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Massand, Neal) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Massand, Neal) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ramrod Licensing LLC (Massand, Neal) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8331853.), filed by Ramrod Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Massand, Neal) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Mobility LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stevenson Moore, V

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal Massand