This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 12:03:33 (UTC).

Ramos v. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Ramos filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Lawrence King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21425

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Lawrence King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miguel Ramos

Defendant

Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathaly Saavedra

Attorney at PereGonza The Attorneys, PLLC

1414 Nw 107Th Ave, Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

Defendant Attorney

Nathan David Chapman

Attorney at Kabat Chapman & Ozmer LLP

171 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1550

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS by Miguel Ramos (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Through and Until June 11, 2021 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. Attorney Nathan David Chapman added to party Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/24/2021 (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Miguel Ramos. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (drz) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase Stayed (jw) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PAPERLESS ORDER Granting re #12 Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Miguel Ramos Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 6/11/2021. (jw) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS by Miguel Ramos (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER Granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Responses due by 6/11/2021 Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 5/11/2021. (jw) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Through and Until June 11, 2021 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. Attorney Nathan David Chapman added to party Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/24/2021 (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Miguel Ramos. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (drz) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Corrected by Miguel Ramos (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #3 Summons Issued. Document Restricted Due to Error; Summons Issued in Error by Clerk. (Party on Summons does not match Party listed on Complaint) (drz) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents. (drz) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (drz) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14605606, filed by Miguel Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comcast Cable Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan David Chapman