This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2019 at 07:28:10 (UTC).

Ramos v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 Ramos filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00469

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Ramos

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production, Inc.

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig Downs

Attorney at Downs Law Group, PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Vanessa Elizabeth Diaz

Attorney at Downs Law Group, PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Nathan Lee Nelson

Attorney at Downs Law Group, PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Joe Micah Williams

Attorney at The Law Offices of Joe M. Williams & Associates

8866 Gulf Freeway, Suite 384

Houston, TX 77019

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Michael Hodges

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Don Keller Haycraft

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Catherine Pyune McEldowney

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Connell Chad Hess

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

600 Travis St, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Georgia Lee Lucier

Attorney at Andrews Kurth Kenyon LLP

600 Travis St, Ste 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas W Taylor

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#21

#19

18 #3

Proposed Order

18 #2

Exhibit B

18 #1

Exhibit A

#18

#17

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

5 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

#4

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SCHEDULING/ DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2019. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 6/17/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 6/17/2019. Deft Expert Witness List due by 7/26/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 7/26/2019. Discovery due by 10/11/2019. Pretrial Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/25/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/10/2020. Docket Call set for 1/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • (#20) Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Initial conference held on March 15, 2019. The court will enter a separate scheduling order, as stated on the record. Appearances: Joe Williams. for Pltf. and Georgia Lucier/Connell Hess for Defts. (Court Reporter: M.Malone), filed.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Williams on behalf of Jose Ramos, filed. (Williams, Joe) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Lucier, Georgia) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thomas W. Taylor, Georgia L. Lucier and Connell C. Hess in place of Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don K. Haycraft (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BP Exploration & Production, Inc., filed.(Taylor, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BP America Production Company, filed.(Taylor, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thomas W. Taylor, Georgia L. Lucier and Connell C. Hess in place of Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don K. Haycraft by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern. Case Number 2:18-cv-08344; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case transferred to District of Southern District of Texas. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/8/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Compliance with Court's Order by Jose Ramos. (Downs, Craig) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re #5 Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Initial DisclosureMaterials and to Continue the Deadline for Venue Filing. GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must provide the completed Plaintiff Profile Form required by Section II(1)(A) of the BELO Cases Initial Proceedings CaseManagement Order ("CMO"), Record Doc. No. #3 , to defendants no later than January 23, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the date on which the parties shall make their venue submission(s) pursuant to Section III of the CMO is hereby continued until 21 days after defendants have received disclosure materials from plaintiff. Plaintiff is instructed that failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/9/2019. (mmv) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7094373) filed by Jose Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Jose Ramos(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joe Micah Williams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vanessa Elizabeth Diaz