This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2020 at 08:26:32 (UTC).

Ramon Carter v. Town Square M Properties, LLC,

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Ramon Carter filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Town Square M Properties, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02100

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramon Carter

Defendant

Town Square M Properties, LLC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Dennis Jay Price, II

Russell C Handy

Defendant Attorney

Scott Talkov

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Town Square M Properties, LLC, answer now due 12/7/2020, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 filed by Defendant Town Square M Properties, LLC,.(Attorney Scott Talkov added to party Town Square M Properties, LLC,(pty:dft))(Talkov, Scott) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ramon Carter, upon Defendant Town Square M Properties, LLC, served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margie Campeon- Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 10/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Town Square M Properties, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ramon Carter, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28438246 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Ramon Carter(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less