This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2020 at 08:26:32 (UTC).

Ramon Carter v. Town Square M Properties, LLC,

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Ramon Carter filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Town Square M Properties, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02100

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramon Carter

Defendant

Town Square M Properties, LLC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Scott Talkov

Attorney at Talkov Law Corp.

2900 Adams Street Suite C225

Riverside, CA 92504-4385

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Town Square M Properties, LLC, answer now due 12/7/2020, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 filed by Defendant Town Square M Properties, LLC,.(Attorney Scott Talkov added to party Town Square M Properties, LLC,(pty:dft))(Talkov, Scott) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ramon Carter, upon Defendant Town Square M Properties, LLC, served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margie Campeon- Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 10/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Town Square M Properties, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ramon Carter, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28438246 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Ramon Carter. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Ramon Carter(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less