This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2021 at 11:44:23 (UTC).

Ramishvili v. Toradze

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Ramishvili filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Toradze. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Therese Wiley Dancks and Glenn T. Suddaby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00274

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Therese Wiley Dancks

Presiding Judge

Glenn T. Suddaby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George Ramishvili

Defendant

Tamar Toradze

Highland, NY 12528

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandra C. Manfredi

Attorney at Reed, Smith LLP - New York Office

599 Lexington Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10022

Rizwan Ahmad Qureshi

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1301 K Street Nw, Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#20

18 #4

Exhibit D

18 #3

Exhibit C

18 #2

Exhibit B

18 #1

Exhibit A

#18

#17

#16

#13

5 #4

E-Filing Registration Form

5 #3

Certificate of Good Standing

5 #2

Petition for Admission

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1-10

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STATUS REPORT by George Ramishvili. (Qureshi, Rizwan) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ORDER granting pro se Defendant's #16 Letter Request for extension of time to file answer to complaint. Tamar Toradze answer due 6/1/2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/28/2021. (A copy of this Text Order has been served on pro se party(ies) via regular mail.) (sg) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Tamar Toradze.Letter Motion, #16 Letter Motion for Tamar Toradze requesting an extension of time to answer the complaint until 5/31/2021 submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks filed by George Ramishvili. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Qureshi, Rizwan) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PRO SE NOTICE only mailed to Tamar Toradze with a note to read, sign, and return for filing. The Local Rules and Pro se Handbook were mailed to deft on 4/2021 along with the Text Order. (see) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Letter Motion from Tamar Toradze, requesting an extension of time to answer the complaint until 5/31/2021. Submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (see) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER directing Plaintiff to, within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of this Text Order, present competent proof establishing, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the matter in controversy exceeds the sum or value of $75,000, exclusive of interest and costs, under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 4/20/2021. (Copy served upon Defendant via regular mail)(sal ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER reserving decision on #13 Defendant's letter-motion for a protective order and granting Plaintiff SEVEN (7) DAYS from the date of this Text Order by which to file a response (which may come in the form of a letter-brief). The Court liberally construes Defendant's letter-motion as one for a preliminary injunction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65 enjoining Plaintiff from communicating with Defendant other than through (his) counsel during the pendency of this action. To the extent Defendant's letter-motion may be liberally construed as also requesting a Temporary Restraining Order or an Order to Show Cause, that letter-motion is denied without prejudice as unsupported by a showing of cause. Furthermore, to the extent Defendant seeks to proceed on her letter-motion ex parte, that request is denied, because she has not demonstrated, in a detailed and specific affidavit, good cause and substantial prejudice that would result from the requirement of reasonable notice. N.D.N.Y. L.R. 7.1(e). Indeed, reasonable notice to Plaintiff's counsel (an officer of the Court) would appear beneficial, if Defendant's allegations regarding harassment by Plaintiff are true. The Clerk's Office is directed to serve on Defendant a courtesy copy of both the District's Local Rules of Practice and the District's Pro Se Handbook (which is mainly intended for pro se plaintiffs but may be of some use for pro se defendants). Finally, Defendant is reminded that the Clerk of Court has entered default against her pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) due to her failure to file a timely Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 4/20/2021. (Copy served upon Defendant, along with a copy of the local rules and pro se handbook, via regular mail)(sal) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for an Immediate Protective Order filed by Tamar Toradze, Pro Se. (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE: filed by Tamar Toradze, Pro Se. (jmb) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER: A Clerks entry of default(Dkt. No. #10 ) was entered by the Clerk against the defendant in this action. Should the Plaintiff choose to move for a default judgment, the appropriate motion pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(b) and Local Rule 55.2(b) must be made within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff must attach a copy of the clerk's entry of default to his moving papers and is directed to serve a copy of the motion papers via regular mail upon defendant and file a certificate of service of same. In the alternative, Plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 5/7/2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/9/2021. (sg ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT noted and entered as to Tamar Toradze, re: #8 Request for Entry of Default (see) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Rizwan Ahmad Qureshi on behalf of George Ramishvili (Qureshi, Rizwan) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tamar Toradze by George Ramishvili. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rizwan A. Qureshi, #2 Proposed Default)(Qureshi, Rizwan) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rizwan Qureshi for Plaintiff. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/23/2021. (sg ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Ramishvili. Tamar Toradze served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Manfredi, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rizwan A. Qureshi Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5459717. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Petition for Admission, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Manfredi, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party plaintiff; Attorney Rizwan A. Qureshi, Email address is rqureshi@reedsmith.com. Phone number is 202.414.9200. Admissions due by 3/24/2021. {Emailed to attorney on 3/10/2021}(see) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/1/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Tamar Toradze. (see) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Tamar Toradze (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5452008) filed by George Ramishvili. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-10, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexandra C. Manfredi