This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2021 at 08:17:28 (UTC).

Ramirez v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Ramirez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01382

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Adelina Faragoza Ramirez

Counter Claimant and Defendant

United of Omaha Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Mark S Humphreys

Attorney at Mark S Humphreys PC

702 Dalworth Street

Grand Prairie, TX 75050

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Jason A. Richardson

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1001 Fannin Street, Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002

Emily Felix

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1000 Ballpark Way, Suite 209

Arlington, TX 76011

Wendy Lynn Furman

Attorney at Edison McDowell & Hetherington LLP

2101 Nw Corporate Blvd, Suite 316

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Proposed Amendment

#13

(#13) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Tanya Cherece Adams added. (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#11

(#11) Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez. (Humphreys, Mark) Modified text on 7/27/2021 (chmb). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE filed by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez re: #7 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/29/2022 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2021. Motions due by 5/2/2022. Discovery due by 4/1/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/26/2022. Settlement Status Report due by 12/30/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 8/8/2022. Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/9/2021) (mla) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#8

(#8) REPORT Regarding Scheduling Order filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint,, filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Adelina Faragoza Ramirez filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez. (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against United of Omaha Life Insurance Company filed by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/6/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/15/2021) (oyh) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company for United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

1 #7

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #5

Exhibit(s) 5

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11971627) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Tanya Cherece Adams added. (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez. (Humphreys, Mark) Modified text on 7/27/2021 (chmb). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE filed by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez re: #7 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/29/2022 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2021. Motions due by 5/2/2022. Discovery due by 4/1/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/26/2022. Settlement Status Report due by 12/30/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 8/8/2022. Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/9/2021) (mla) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT Regarding Scheduling Order filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint,, filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Adelina Faragoza Ramirez filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez. (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against United of Omaha Life Insurance Company filed by Adelina Faragoza Ramirez. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Humphreys, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/6/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/15/2021) (oyh) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company for United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11971627) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United of Omaha Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Steven Humphreys